(HC) Patrick Piceno v. Anglea
Petitioner: Patrick Piceno
Respondent: H.B. Anglea
Case Number: 1:2020cv01154
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, #6 Judgment served on Patrick Piceno. (Rivera, O)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGMENT dated *10/7/2020* pursuant to order #5 . (Rivera, O)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING #4 Findings and Recommendations, Dismissing Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Directing the Clerk of Court to Close Case, and Declining to Issue Certificate of Appealability, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/7/2020. CASE CLOSED. (Rivera, O)
August 21, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Findings and Recommendations, #3 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Patrick Piceno. (Jessen, A)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Habeas Corpus Petition be DISMISSED and the Clerk of Court be Directed to Provide Petitioner With a Blank Civil Rights Complaint Form re #1 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/21/2020. Referred to Unassigned DJ. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE: This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-01154-NONE-JLT (HC). (Jessen, A)
August 19, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, CAED Receipt served on Patrick Piceno. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 18, 2020 RECEIPT number #CAE100046361 $5.00 fbo Patrick Piceno F-83751 by State of California on 8/18/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against H.B. Anglea by Patrick Piceno.(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Patrick Piceno v. Anglea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick Piceno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: H.B. Anglea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?