Anita Valladores et al v. Ashtree Apartments, LLC
Plaintiff: Anita Valladores, D. C. and K. C.
Defendant: Ashtree Apartments, LLC Doing business as Ashtree Apartments
Case Number: 1:2020cv01155
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Anita Valladores' Petition for Appointment of Guardian ad Litem ad Litem for Her Minor Children signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/31/2020. (Jessen, A)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM by D. C., K. C., Anita Valladores. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fagan, Stuart)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING #3 Motion to Proceed IFP, without prejudice and REQUIRING Plaintiffs to File a Petition for Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem; hearing set for September 25, 2020 is VACATED, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/18/2020.( 10-Day Deadline) (Attachments: #1 AO 239 Form) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET by D. C., K. C., Anita Valladores (Fagan, Stuart)
August 18, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Text Entry Only)(Martin-Gill, S)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Attn: Stuart E. Fagan **Wrong Image Attached to #1 Civil Cover Sheet***PLEASE FILE: Civil Cover SheetUnder Local Rule 3-200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by acompleted civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If youneed assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 SAB Sched Conf, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ashtree Apartments, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stuart E. Fagan* *Law Offices of Stuart E. Fagan* *P.O. Box 365* *Wheaton, IL 60187*. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 17, 2020 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-9059433. (Fagan, Stuart)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by D. C., K. C., Anita Valladores. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2020 at 09:00 AM in cvbFRES Fresno before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. (Fagan, Stuart)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Anita Valladores, D. C., K. C..(Fagan, Stuart)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by D. C., K. C., Anita Valladores (Fagan, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anita Valladores et al v. Ashtree Apartments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Valladores
Represented By: Stuart E. Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. C.
Represented By: Stuart E. Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. C.
Represented By: Stuart E. Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashtree Apartments, LLC Doing business as Ashtree Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?