(HC) Jaborie Brown v. Warden
Petitioner: Jaborie Brown
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 1:2020cv01156
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
August 24, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, #5 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Jaborie Brown. (Sant Agata, S)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss #1 Petition as Duplicative and Successive signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/24/2020. Referred to Judge Unassigned DJ. Objections to F&R due within Ten (10) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-1156-NONE-JLT(HC). (Sant Agata, S)
August 19, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jaborie Brown. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Jaborie Brown, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/19/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 2241 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Warden by Jaborie Brown.(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Jaborie Brown v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jaborie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?