Harris v. Concord Servicing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Angela Harris
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Concord Servicing Corporation and Transunion LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01158
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Pursuant to the Notice of Settlement as to Transunion, LLC, document #13 , the Court vacates any and all deadlines and hearings pertaining to said defendant only. The Court directs the parties to file the appropriate dismissal documents no later than 12/15/2020. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/9/2020. (Rooney, M)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Pursuant to the Notice of Settlement as to Equifax Information Service, LLC, document #12 , the Court vacates any and all deadlines and hearings pertaining to said defendant only. The Court directs the parties to file the appropriate dismissal documents no later than 12/15/2020. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/9/2020. (Rooney, M)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT CONCORD SERVICING CORPORATIONS TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NO MORE THAN 30 DAYS by Angela Harris. (Martin, George)
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT as to Transunion LLC,only by Angela Harris. Dispositional Docs due by 11/27/2020. (Martin, George)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT as to Equifax Information Services, LLC only by Angela Harris. Dispositional Docs due by 10/26/2020. (Martin, George)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Concord Servicing Corporation served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. (Martin, George)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending time to respond by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Attorney Quinn, Thomas P. added. (Quinn, Thomas)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Transunion LLC served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Martin, George)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Martin, George)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER by Transunion LLC.(Blair, Christopher)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/1/2020. Added attorney Christopher L. Blair, PHV for Transunion LLC (Martin-Gill, S)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Transunion LLC. (Booth, Eileen)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Transunion LLC for attorney Christopher H. Blair to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Booth, Eileen T. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9089552) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Booth, Eileen)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Concord Servicing Corporation, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Transunion LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *George Thomas Martin, III* *Martin & Bontrager, APC* *4605 Lankershim Blvd., Suite 535* *Toluca Lake, CA 91602*. (Jessen, A)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Concord Servicing Corporation, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Transunion LLC by Angela Harris. Attorney Martin, George Thomas added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9059398) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Concord Servicing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concord Servicing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Blair, PHV
Represented By: Eileen T. Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Harris
Represented By: George Thomas Martin, III
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?