(SS) Morales v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Santiago Morales
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv01160
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/15/2020: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 1:20-cv-01160-JLT. (Rivera, O)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Talbert, Daniel)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Santiago Morales. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/16/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Santiago Morales pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: Consent or Decline due by 11/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM Social Security Instructions) (Rivera, O)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Rivera, O)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to Issue Summons, Social Security Case Documents, and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/26/2020. (Rivera, O)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/19/2020. (Hall, S)
August 18, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Marrujo, C)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Santiago Morales. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commisioner of Social Security by Santiago Morales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Morales v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Daniel P. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santiago Morales
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?