Singh v. Allied Collection Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gurpreet G. Singh
Defendant: Allied Collection Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01161
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Allied Collection Services, Inc.. (Felipe, June)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Allied Collection Services, Inc..(Felipe, June)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Due to the status of the case, the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 10/27/2020, is CONTINUED to 11/17/2020, at 9:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, The parties SHALL file their joint scheduling report 7 days prior to the conference. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/25/2020. (Kusamura, W)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re Stipulation to Set Aside Default, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/22/2020. (Answer Deadline: 10/6/2020). (Marrujo, C)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT re #5 Request for Entry of Default, #6 Clerk's Entry of Default by Allied Collection Services, Inc.. Attorney Felipe, June Grace added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Felipe, June)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Allied Collection Services, Inc.* (Sant Agata, S)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Allied Collection Services, Inc. by Gurpreet G. Singh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Wajda, Nicholas)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Allied Collection Services, Inc. served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Wajda, Nicholas)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Allied Collection Services, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nicholas Michal Wajda* *Wajda Law Group, APC* *6167 Bristol Parkway, Suite 200* *Culver City, CA 90230*. (Lundstrom, T)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allied Collection Services, Inc. by Gurpreet G. Singh. Attorney Wajda, Nicholas Michal added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9061669) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wajda, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Allied Collection Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurpreet G. Singh
Represented By: Nicholas Michal Wajda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Collection Services, Inc.
Represented By: David Jay Kaminski
Represented By: June Grace Felipe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?