Favor VEXATIOUS LITIGANT v. Black Lives Matter et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Alexander Favor VEXATIOUS LITIGANT
Defendant: Black Lives Matter, Michelle Obama, Amaro Records Incorporated and Reba Ann Stevens
Case Number: 1:2020cv01165
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Brandon Alexander Favor VEXATIOUS LITIGANT. (Jessen, A)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Brandon Alexander Favor VEXATIOUS LITIGANT. (Jessen, A)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE by Brandon Alexander Favor VEXATIOUS LITIGANT to #2 Order. (Jessen, A)
September 15, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Findings and Recommendations served on Brandon Alexander Favor VEXATIOUS LITIGANT. (Jessen, A)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED and Plaintiff be Ordered to Pay the Filing Fee in Full re #1 Complaint filed by Brandon Alexander Favor VEXATIOUS LITIGANT signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/14/2020. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Brandon Alexander Favor VEXATIOUS LITIGANT. (Jessen, A)
August 20, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order served on Brandon Alexander Favor VEXATIOUS LITIGANT. (Jessen, A)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Pay the $400 Filing Fee or Submit a Completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Within Thirty (30) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Jessen, A)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amaro Records Incorporated, Black Lives Matter, Michelle Obama, Reba Ann Stevens by Brandon Alexander Favor VEXATIOUS LITIGANT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Favor VEXATIOUS LITIGANT v. Black Lives Matter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Lives Matter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amaro Records Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reba Ann Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Alexander Favor VEXATIOUS LITIGANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?