Leomi Tienda, et al v. Adventist Health Hanford, et al
Plaintiff: Leomi Tienda and Jimmy Tienda
Defendant: David Wayne Nelson, Samuel Morales, United States of America and Adventist Health Hanford
Case Number: 1:2020cv01169
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Dismiss Claims Against the United States and REMANDING to State Court, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/10/2020. Certified copy of remand order sent to Kings County Superior Court. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Adventist Health Hanford.(White, William)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Claims Against the United States; Proposed Order by United States of America. (Lodge, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Samuel Morales.(Thelen, Kevin)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Jimmy Tienda, Leomi Tienda. (Ounjian, Robert)
August 21, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, served on Robert J. Ounjian NCAE, Sasha J. Skaf NCAE. (Marrujo, C)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of the Court to Terminate David Wayne Nelson as a Defendant in This Matter; ORDER REQUIRING Defendants to File Responsive Pleading, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/21/2020. FOURTEEN DAY Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 19, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Notice - Other served on Robert J. Ounjian NCAE, Sasha J. Skaf NCAE. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE directing Attorney Robert J. Ounjian and Sasha J. Skaf,NCAED to submit Petition to Practice in the Eastern District of California (Martin-Gill, S)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Substitution of United States of America in Place of David Wayne Nelson, M.D. by United States of America. Attorney Lodge, Jeffrey James added. (Lodge, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kings County Superior Court, case number 20C-0041 by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Course and Scope of Employment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proof of Service)(Lodge, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leomi Tienda, et al v. Adventist Health Hanford, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wayne Nelson
Represented By: Jeffrey James Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Morales
Represented By: Gary L. Logan
Represented By: Kevin Emil Thelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jeffrey James Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adventist Health Hanford
Represented By: William M. White
Represented By: Tara M. Tarasen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leomi Tienda
Represented By: Robert J. Ounjian, NCAE
Represented By: Sasha J. Skaf, NCAE
Represented By: Robert J. Ounjian
Represented By: Sasha Jeannette Skaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Tienda
Represented By: Robert J. Ounjian, NCAE
Represented By: Sasha J. Skaf, NCAE
Represented By: Robert J. Ounjian
Represented By: Sasha Jeannette Skaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?