R.S. et al v. County of Stanislaus et al
Plaintiff: R. S. and Jorge Vicente
Defendant: Dustin Willey, Colton Hughes, Morin Yom, County of Stanislaus, Miguel Garcia, Barry Balance, Eric Garcia, Benjamin Carnes, Danny Anderson, Alberto Navarro, Robert Domingos and Eric Torres
Case Number: 1:2020cv01170
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/9/2020. (Kusamura, W)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for an Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by County of Stanislaus. Attorney Paul, Jonathan B. added. (Paul, Jonathan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants. (Galipo, Dale)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2020 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Alberto Navarro, Eric Torres, Dustin Willey, Morin Yom* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Dale K. Galipo* *21800 Burbank Blvd.* *Suite 310* *Woodland Hills, CA 91367*. (Sant Agata, S)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Robert Domingos, Eric Garcia, Miguel Garcia, Colton Hughes* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Dale K. Galipo* *21800 Burbank Blvd.* *Suite 310* *Woodland Hills, CA 91367*. (Sant Agata, S)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Danny Anderson, Barry Balance, Benjamin Carnes, County of Stanislaus* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Dale K. Galipo* *21800 Burbank Blvd.* *Suite 310* *Woodland Hills, CA 91367*. (Sant Agata, S)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Jessica Moreno as Guardian ad Litem for R.S. as Successor in Interest to Rudy Santillan, Sr.. (Galipo, Dale)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Appointment of Guardian ad Litem for minor plaintiff R.S. by R. S., Jorge Vicente. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Nominee, #2 Proposed Order)(Galipo, Dale)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by R. S., Jorge Vicente (Galipo, Dale)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jorge Vicente, R. S.. Attorney Galipo, Dale K. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9065038) (Galipo, Dale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.S. et al v. County of Stanislaus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. S.
Represented By: Renee S. Valentine
Represented By: Dale K. Galipo
Represented By: Jaime A. Leanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Vicente
Represented By: Renee S. Valentine
Represented By: Dale K. Galipo
Represented By: Jaime A. Leanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colton Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morin Yom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Stanislaus
Represented By: Jonathan B. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Balance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Carnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Domingos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?