Manzo v. McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gennifer Manzo
Defendant: McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01175
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) BC499888, 1:20-cv-00927-AWI-EPG by McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc.. Attorney Israel-Trummel, Kelsey A. added. (Israel-Trummel, Kelsey)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION To Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc.. Attorney Ritchey, Cindi L. added. (Ritchey, Cindi)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc. served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Lee, Larry)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 10:30 AM in Yosemite (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Larry W. Lee* *Diversity Law Group* *515 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 1250* *Los Angeles, CA 90071*. (Marrujo, C)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc. by Gennifer Manzo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Larry)
August 19, 2020 RECEIPT number 0972-9065078 for $400.00 paid by Larry W. Lee on 8/19/2020 fbo Gennifer Manzo. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manzo v. McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gennifer Manzo
Represented By: Edward Wonkyu Choi
Represented By: William Lucas Marder
Represented By: Larry W. Lee
Represented By: Dennis Hyun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Israel-Trummel
Represented By: Cindi L. Ritchey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?