Riley v. Ploutz et al
Plaintiff: Donna Riley
Defendant: State of California Franchise Tax Board, Seeger Industries, Inc., United States of America, Internal Revenue Service, Granada Park Homeowner's Association, William R. Morehead, Lloyd G. Ploutz and City of Modesto
Case Number: 1:2020cv01177
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER by Granada Park Homeowner's Association. Attorney Cendejas, Susana C. added.(Cendejas, Susana)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER, CROSSCLAIM against Lloyd G. Ploutz by United States of America, Internal Revenue Service. by United States of America, Internal Revenue Service.(Hoenig, Isaac)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER, CROSSCLAIM against City of Modesto, Granada Park Homeowner's Association, Lloyd G. Ploutz, Donna Riley, Seeger Industries, Inc., State of California Franchise Tax Board, United States of America, Internal Revenue Service by William R. Morehead. Attorney Dyer, Michael added. by William R. Morehead. Attorney Dyer, Michael added.(Dyer, Michael)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Lloyd G. Ploutz on 9/24/2020, Answer due 11/23/2020 (Solish, Daniel)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Granada Park Homeowner's Association served on 8/13/2020. (Solish, Daniel)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal With Prejudice by City of Modesto. (Mehretu, David)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order concerning stipulation and proposed order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/15/2020. (Filing Deadline: 9/23/2020) (Rosales, O.)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant City of Modesto by City of Modesto. (Mehretu, David)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE Disclaimer by Defendant by City of Modesto. Attorney Mehretu, David added. (Mehretu, David)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/9/2020. On August 20, 2020, defendant United States of America removed this action to this federal court. (Doc. No. #1 .) The documents attached to the notice of removal, however, did not include the first amended complaint, which is the operative complaint from the state court action. Instead, defendant United States of America only included the original complaint. As a result, one of the named defendants in the first amended complaint-the City of Modesto-does not appear on the docket in this action. On September 8, 2020, defendant United States of America filed a supplement to its August 20, 2020 notice of removal, attaching the first amended complaint from the state court action (see Doc. No. 9-6). Accordingly, the court directs the Clerk of the Court to update the docket to include the City of Modesto as a named defendant in this action. (Thorp, J)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT by United States of America, Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Case Management Conference, #3 Exhibit Burch Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit Burch Notice and Acknowledgment, #5 Exhibit Seeger Proof of Service, #6 Exhibit Seeger Notice and Acknowledgment, #7 Exhibit Ploutz Proof of Service, #8 Exhibit Ploutz Notice and Acknowledgment, #9 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit Amended Summons, #11 Exhibit Minute Order, #12 Exhibit Modesto Proof of Service, #13 Exhibit Seeger Industries Answer, #14 Exhibit Seeger Cross Complaint, #15 Exhibit State Court Notice of Notice of Removal, #16 Exhibit Disclaimer of Interest by Franchise Tax Board)(Hoenig, Isaac)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by United States of America, Internal Revenue Service. (Hoenig, Isaac)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America, Internal Revenue Service (Hoenig, Isaac)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE: Attn:Isaac Mitchell Hoenig ***Civil Cover Sheet***Under Local Rule 3-200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by acompleted civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If youneed assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Stanislaus, case number CV-20-002949 by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State court documents mailed to the United States)(Hoenig, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley v. Ploutz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Franchise Tax Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seeger Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Isaac Mitchell Hoenig, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granada Park Homeowner's Association
Represented By: Susana C. Cendejas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Morehead
Represented By: Michael Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd G. Ploutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Modesto
Represented By: David Mehretu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Riley
Represented By: Daniel Perry Solish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?