Donovin Last v. M-I, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Donovin Last
Defendant: M-I, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01205
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: BakersfieldMJ
Referring Judge: Ana de Alba
2 Judge: Dale A Drozd
3 Judge: Erica P Grosjean
4 Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 REQUEST for Leave to File a Reply In Support of Its Objections to the Findings and Recommendations (Dkt. 85) by M-I, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Reply In Support of Its Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations Regarding Class Certification, Defendant's Ojbections, and Defendant's Motion to Strike)(Hearne, Heather)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 RESPONSE by Donovin Last to #86 Objections to Findings and Recommendations. (Dion-Kindem, Peter)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #85 by Defendant M-I, L.L.C.. (Hearne, Heather)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on December 27, 2022, recommending as follows: 1. Plaintiff's motion for class certification (ECF No. #38 ) be granted, in part, and that the Court certify the following class pursuant to Rule 23(b)(3): a. All persons who at any time from May 20, 2016 to the date of certification worked as employees of M-I, L.L.C. or provided services on behalf of M-I, L.L.C. in California in job positions titled "Drilling Fluid Specialist" (mud man, Levels I-IV and mud man Senior), mud engineer," "mud man," "mud man Trainee," "mud man consultant" and/or equivalent job titles who have not released all claims asserted in this action and who are not subject to an arbitration agreement applicable to the services such person provided on behalf of M-I, L.LC in California during the class period. b. All members of Class 1 who at any time during the period beginning on May 20, 2017, and ending on the date of certification were either voluntarily or involuntarily separated from their employment with or stopped providing services on behalf of M-I, L.L.C. 2. Defendant's motion to strike (ECF No. #57 ) be denied; 3. Defendant's objections (ECF No. #53 ) be overruled.These Findings and Recommendations will be submitted to the United States District Court Judge assigned to this action pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636 (b)(1). Within TWENTY-ONE (21) days after being served with a copy of these Findings and Recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. Such a document should be captioned "Objections to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations." Any reply to the objections shall be served and filed within TWENTY-ONE (21) days after service of the objections. The parties are advised that failure to file objections within the specified time may result in the waiver of rights on appeal. Wilkerson v. Wheeler, 772 F.3d 834, 839 (9th Cir. 2014) (citing Baxter v. Sullivan, 923 F.2d 1391, 1394 (9th Cir. 1991)). (Rooney, M)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 CLERK'S NOTICE: (text entry only) This case has been assigned to District Judge Ana de Alba and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. BakersfieldMJ no longer assigned to the case. The new case no. is: 1:20-cv-1205-ADA-EPG. (Gonzalez, R)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on September 8, 2022: The parties have jointly informed the Court that a settlement conference would not be fruitful at this time. (See ECF No. 77 ). Accordingly, the Court will not set a settlement conference at this time. Please note that a settlement conference will be required before this case proceeds to a pretrial conference. (Text Only Entry)(Rooney, M)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 JOINT STATEMENT of Case filed by Defendant M-I, L.L.C.. (Hearne, Heather)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 8/31/2022: (Text Only Entry) This matter is set for hearing before District Judge de Alba. The parties are ordered to submit a joint status report, not to exceed five pages, within 10 court days, that addresses the following: What is the procedural history of the case? Is the motion presently before the court still at issue for the parties? Have the parties engaged in settlement negotiations whether formally or informally? If so, when? Would the parties benefit from a mandatory settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge? Would the parties benefit from a status conference with Judge de Alba? The parties are further advised that due to the judicial resource emergency and COVID pandemic, there are more than 130 motions currently under submission in Judge de Alba's recently re-assigned caseload. The Court understands the impact that such a backlog has on the parties and although the Court will continue working diligently to resolve all pending motions, it may still be months before the parties' pending motion is resolved. As such, in light of having the heaviest district court caseload in the nation, limited Court resources, and the need to prioritize criminal and older civil matters over more recently filed actions, this Court strongly encourages the parties to consent to conduct all further proceedings before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (Hernandez, M)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OBJECTIONS by Defendant M-I, L.L.C. to #78 Statement. (Hearne, Heather)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of *District Judge Ana de Alba* to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from *District Judge Dale A. Drozd* to District Judge Ana de Alba for all further proceedings. (Lawrence, A)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 AMENDED STATEMENT of regarding Amended Class Notice filed by Plaintiff Donovin Last re 77 Minute Order,,. (Dion-Kindem, Peter)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on August 15, 2022: As discussed on the record at the August 12, 2022, hearing on Plaintiff's motion for class certification (ECF No. #38 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED no later than August 19, 2022, Plaintiff shall file an amended statement of the proposed class definition as well as the number of proposed class members under the amended proposed class definition. Plaintiff's statement shall be no longer than two pages. The Court further directed the parties to jointly email Michelle Rooney (mrooney@caed.uscourts.gov) within fourteen days regarding their interest in participating in a settlement conference. (Text Only Entry)(Rooney, M)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: MOTION HEARING held on 8/12/2022. The Court heard argument on plaintiff's motion to certify class and motion to strike, documents #38 and #57 , with an order to follow. Plaintiff's Counsel Peter Dion-Kindem and Lonnie Blanchard telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel Heather Hearne personally present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO - Araceli Gil-Garcia. (Rooney, M)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/9/2022: For telephonic participation at the Motion to Certify Class and Motion to Strike, documents #38 and #57 , noticed for hearing on 8/12/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean, the parties are directed to use the following dial-in information: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. (Rooney, M)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RESPONSE by Donovin Last to #73 Notice - Other. (Dion-Kindem, Peter)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Regarding Defendant M-I, LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration by M-I, L.L.C. re #55 MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration . (Hearne, Heather)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING #70 Defendant's Request to File Sur-Reply; ORDER CONTINUING HEARING on #57 Defendant's Motion to Strike, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/28/2022. Hearing on Motion to Strike is CONTINUED from 7/8/2022 to 8/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Hall, S)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 EXHIBIT A to Defendant M-I, LLC's Sur-Reply In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by M-I, L.L.C. re #70 Request. (Hearne, Heather)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REQUEST for Leave to File A Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by M-I, L.L.C.. (Hearne, Heather)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Donovin Last to #65 Reply to Response to Motion. (Dion-Kindem, Peter)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RESPONSE by Donovin Last to #53 Objections. (Dion-Kindem, Peter)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 REPLY by Donovin Last re #52 Opposition to Motion, #38 Motion to Certify Class,,. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Peter R. Dion-Kindem, #2 Supplemental Declaration of Justin Regus, #3 Objections to Declarations Submitted by M-I, LLC in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)(Dion-Kindem, Peter)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPLY by M-I, L.L.C. to RESPONSE to #57 Motion to Strike,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heather D. Hearne)(Hearne, Heather)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPLY by M-I, L.L.C. to RESPONSE to #55 Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heather D. Hearne)(Hearne, Heather)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 OPPOSITION by Donovin Last to #57 Motion to Strike,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lonnie C. Blanchard, III)(Dion-Kindem, Peter)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPPOSITION by Donovin Last to #55 Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter R. Dion-Kindem, #2 Declaration of Donovin Last)(Dion-Kindem, Peter)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #55 Motion to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hearne, Heather)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SEALED EVENT (Attachments: #1 #2 ) (Gonzalez, R)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 SEALED EVENT (Gonzalez, R)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING #54 Defendant's Request to Seal, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/27/2022. (Hall, S)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/24/2022: Defendant's motion to strike (Doc. #57 ) will be heard by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Additionally, to accommodate the Court's calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing on the motion to strike is continued from June 24, 2022 to July 8, 2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Text Only Entry) (Hall, S)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION to STRIKE DEPOSITION ERRATA SHEETS OF MICHAEL A. KAVELER AND NATHAN WILLIAM GHOLZ. by M-I, L.L.C.. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Hearne, Heather)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 20-cv-1205: (Text Only Entry) On May 19, 2022, defendant filed a #55 motion to compel arbitration, but defendant's motion does not comply with Local Rule 230, as amended on March 1, 2022. In particular, defendants have noticed the motion for a hearing on June 21, 2022, which does not comply with Local Rule 230(b), which states that "[t]he matter shall be set for hearing... not less than thirty-five (35) days after service and filing of the motion." L.R. 230(b). Defendant is directed to file an amended notice of motion, in compliance with Local Rule 230(b). Defendant is advised that the next available hearing dates for hearings before Judge Drozd are July 5, 2022 and July 19, 2022. In addition, the parties are advised that pursuant to Local Rule 230, the filing deadline for opposition briefs is calculated based on the motion filing date (here, May 20, 2022), and the filing deadline for reply briefs is calculated based on the opposition filing date. The opposition and reply deadlines are not calculated based on the hearing date. The parties are also advised that in light of the ongoing public health emergency posed by the coronavirus (COVID-19) pandemic, and given the long-standing lack of judicial resources in the Eastern District of California, all civil motions set for hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd will be decided on the papers. The parties should not contact Judge Drozd's chambers to inquire about whether a hearing on a pending motion will be held. If the court determines that a hearing is necessary, the court will issue an order to specially set the motion for hearing by telephone or video conference.(Hernandez, M)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration by M-I, L.L.C.. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Hearne, Heather)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by M-I, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hearne, Heather)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 OBJECTIONS by Defendant M-I, L.L.C. to #38 MOTION to CERTIFY CLASS . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hearne, Heather)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 OPPOSITION by M-I, L.L.C. to #38 Motion to Certify Class,,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Declaration, #9 Declaration, #10 Declaration, #11 Declaration, #12 Declaration, #13 Declaration)(Hearne, Heather)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #50 Third Stipulation to Extend Class Certification Briefing and Hearing Dates, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/11/2022. Opposition due by 5/20/2022; Reply due by 6/17/2022. Hearing remains set for 8/12/2022. (Hall, S)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for The Continuance of Class Certification Briefing and Hearing Dates re #48 Stipulation and Proposed Order by M-I, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hearne, Heather)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING #48 Second Stipulation to Extend Class Certification Briefing and Hearing Dates, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/30/2022. Opposition due by 5/6/2022. Reply due by 6/3/2022. Hearing on Motion for Class Certification continued to 8/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Hall, S)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Class Certification Briefing and Hearing Dates re #47 Stipulation and Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, by M-I, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hearne, Heather)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING AND HEARING DATES signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/04/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Defendant's opposition to Plaintiff's motion for class certification (ECF No. #38 ) shall be filed by April 22, 2022. Plaintiff's reply to the opposition shall be filed by May 20, 2022. The hearing on Plaintiff's motion for class certification, currently set for May 17, 2022, is continued to July 15, 2022, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Gonzales, V)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING AND HEARING DATES re #9 Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,, by M-I, L.L.C.. (Hearne, Heather)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SEALED EVENT. (Sant Agata, S)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SEALED EVENT. (Sant Agata, S)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SEALED EVENT. (Sant Agata, S)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SEALED EVENT. (Sant Agata, S)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SEALED EVENT. (Sant Agata, S)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SEALED EVENT. (Sant Agata, S)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SEALED EVENT. (Sant Agata, S)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to CERTIFY CLASS by Donovin Last. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, #2 Declaration of Peter R. Dion-Kindem, #3 Declaration of Lonnie C. Blanchard, III, #4 Declaration of Justin Regus, #5 Declaration of Donovin Last, #6 Declaration of Nathan Gholz, #7 Declaration of Michael Kaveler, #8 Declaration of Jeff Wilson)(Dion-Kindem, Peter)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #35 Request to Seal signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/11/2022. (Sant Agata, S)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Donovin Last to #35 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s). (Dion-Kindem, Peter)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by M-I, L.L.C.. (Hearne, Heather)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(EPG)* (Jessen, A)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Intent to File Information Designated as Confidential in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by Donovin Last. (Dion-Kindem, Peter)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER AFTER INFORMAL TELECONFERENCE re DISCOVERY DISPUTE #29 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/10/2021. (Hall, S)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held telephonically before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: INFORMAL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE re DISCOVERY DISPUTE #29 held off the record on 9/10/2021. Court to issue order. Plaintiffs Counsel Peter Dion-Kindem and Lonnie Blanchard present. Defendants Counsel Heather Hearne and Robert Lombardi present. (Hall, S)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/9/2021: Pursuant to the request (Doc. #29 ), an INFORMAL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE re Discovery Dispute is set for 9/10/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Counsel shall appear via teleconference by dialing (888) 557-8511 and entering Access Code 1652736. (Text Only Entry) (Hall, S)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 JOINT INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE LETTER BRIEF filed by Donovin Last. (Dion-Kindem, Peter)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #27 Application for Pro Hac Vice of Robert Lombardi, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/26/2021. Added attorney Robert Peter Lombardi, PHV for M-I, L.L.C.. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Marrujo, C)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by M-I, L.L.C. for attorney Robert P. Lombardi to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9783386) (Hearne, Heather)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #25 Stipulation to Continue the Hearing on the Motion for Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/10/2021. (Hall, S)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION To Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Protective Order by M-I, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hearne, Heather)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/10/2021: In light of the failure to file a joint statement re discovery disagreement as required by Local Rule 251(a), the hearing set for 8/16/2021 on the Motion for Protective Order (Doc. #23 ) is DROPPED from the Court's calendar without prejudice and the motion is terminated. (Text Only Entry)(Hall, S)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER by M-I, L.L.C.. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Hearne, Heather)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/02/2021. (Maldonado, C)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER After Mid-Discovery Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/14/2021. (Hall, S)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: MID-DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/14/2021. Discovery issues addressed; Court to issue order. Plaintiff's Counsel Peter Dion-Kindem present. Defendant's Counsel Heather Hearne present. Court Reporter: ECRO- A. Timken. (Hall, S)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/5/2021: On the Court's own motion, the Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 5/10/2021 is CONTINUED to 5/14/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Text Only Entry) (Hall, S)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT by M-I, L.L.C.. (Hearne, Heather)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRO HAC VICE ORDER #15 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/21/2021. Attorney MaryJo L. Roberts added PHV for M-I, L.L.C.(Lundstrom, T)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by M-I, L.L.C. for attorney MaryJo L. Roberts to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9555967) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record Certificate of Good Standing)(Hearne, Heather)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Donovin Last to #12 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (Dion-Kindem, Peter)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/1/2021: (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that pursuant to General Order No. 617, addressing the public health emergency posed by the coronavirus (COVID-19) outbreak, all civil motions set for hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd will be decided on the papers. The parties should not contact Judge Drozd's chambers to inquire about whether a hearing on a pending motion will be held. If the court determines that a hearing is necessary, the court will issue an order to specially set the motion for hearing by telephone or video conference. In accordance with Judge Drozd's Standing Order in Light of Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California, the hearing date selected by the movant will continue to govern the deadlines for opposition and reply briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(c). (Thorp, J)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION For Leave to File First Amended Answer by M-I, L.L.C.. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hearne, Heather) Modified on 3/1/2021 added hearing date (Thorp, J).
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROTECTIVE ORDER and CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT #10 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/22/2021. (Hall, S)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER and Confidentiality Agreement (Stipulated by Plaintiff and Defendant) by M-I, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hearne, Heather)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/29/2020. Pleading Amendment Deadline 2/26/2021. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 11/22/2020; Non-Expert (Class Issues) 4/5/2022. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 5/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Class Certification Motion Deadlines: Filed by 1/11/2022; Opposition by 3/8/2022; Reply by 4/5/2022; Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2022 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Donovin Last. (Attachments: #1 Joint Scheduling Worksheet)(Dion-Kindem, Peter)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Hearne, Heather)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Dion-Kindem, Peter)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION and ORDER #4 Regarding Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/28/2020. Initial Scheduling Conference RESET for 11/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Regarding Scheduling Conference re #3 Civil New Case Documents for DAD, by M-I, L.L.C.. (Hearne, Heather)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 JLT Worksheet, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by M-I, L.L.C. (Hearne, Heather)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, Kern County, case number BCV-20-101210 by M-I, L.L.C.. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9078128) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hearne, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donovin Last v. M-I, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donovin Last
Represented By: Peter R. Dion-Kindem
Represented By: Lonnie C. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-I, L.L.C.
Represented By: Heather Dawn Hearne
Represented By: MaryJo L. Roberts, PHV
Represented By: Robert Peter Lombardi, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?