(SS) Marin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Raymond Anthony Marin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv01419
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Jenkins, Chantal)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The parties are hereby notified that pursuant to General Order Number 615, this action has been stayed pending further order of the court. See E.D. Cal. G.O. No. 615, paragraphs 6, 10. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/27/2020. CASE STAYED. (Valdez, E)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Raymond Anthony Marin. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (Rivera, O)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-01419-NONE-BAM. (Rivera, O)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Raymond Anthony Marin pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 1/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM Social Security Instructions) (Marrujo, C)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Marrujo, C)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/6/2020. (Marrujo, C)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Raymond Anthony Marin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Raymond Anthony Marin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)
October 5, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Marin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Chantal Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Anthony Marin
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?