(PC) Beckett v. Moreno et al
Plaintiff: Matthew H. Beckett
Defendant: E. Moreno and Sedillo
Case Number: 1:2020cv01427
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/12/2020. Objections to F&R due within FOURTEEN DAYS. (Marrujo, C)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-1427-NONE-BAM (PC). (Marrujo, C)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), #13 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Matthew H. Beckett. (Marrujo, C)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Matthew H. Beckett.(Sant Agata, S)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint or Notify Court of Willingness to Proceed on Cognizable Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/14/2020. First Amended Complaint or Notice due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form) (Rivera, O)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Screening Order served on Matthew H. Beckett. (Rivera, O)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Sant Agata, S)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Matthew H. Beckett. (Sant Agata, S)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Henshaw, R)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:20-cv-1927 JDP) to Fresno (1:20-cv-1427 BAM) signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 10/6/2020. (Henshaw, R)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order and #8 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Matthew H. Beckett. (Henshaw, R)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge *Edmund F. Brennan* to *Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson* for all further proceedings. As of October 1, 2020, Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson is reassigned to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California. (Donati, J)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Reassigning Magistrate Judge, served on Matthew H. Beckett. (Donati, J)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Matthew H. Beckett (Becknal, R)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Matthew H. Beckett, CDC BB-6269 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *9/25/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 11/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Kastilahn, A)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Matthew H. Beckett. (Kastilahn, A)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Matthew H. Beckett. (Kastilahn, A)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Matthew H. Beckett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Beckett v. Moreno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew H. Beckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?