(HC) Austin v. Stanislaus County Superior Court
Petitioner: Steven Oscar Blackwell Austin
Respondent: Stanislaus County Superior Court
Case Number: 1:2020cv01449
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order to Show Cause served on Steven Oscar Blackwell Austin. (Rivera, O)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Petition Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Exhaust State Remedies, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/15/2020. Show Cause Response due within 30 days. (Rivera, O)
October 14, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Steven Oscar Blackwell Austin. (Rivera, O)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due by 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Rivera, O)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Steven Oscar Blackwell Austin, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/14/2020. (Rivera, O)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 USCA ORDER. PETITION TRANSFERRED to the district court. (Rivera, O)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Stanislaus County Superior Court by Steven Oscar Blackwell Austin. (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Austin v. Stanislaus County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Oscar Blackwell Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stanislaus County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?