(HC) Johnson v. On Habeas Corpus
Petitioner: Byron C. Johnson
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Case Number: 1:2020cv01453
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 16, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, Case Transferred Out - Divisional served on Byron C. Johnson. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/15/2020. CASE TRANSFERRRED to SACRAMENTO Division. New Case Number 2:20-cv-2060 GGH (HC). Old Case Number 1:20-cv-1453 SKO (HC). (Martin-Gill, S)
October 14, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order Authorizing IFP Status, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Byron C Johnson. (Maldonado, C)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Petitioner's Consent or Decline due by 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Maldonado, C)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Byron Johnson; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/14/2020. (Maldonado, C)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Byron C Johnson. (Maldonado, C)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against On Habeas Corpus by Byron C Johnson.(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Johnson v. On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Byron C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?