(PC) Castro v. Waddle
Plaintiff: Daniel Z. Castro
Defendant: C. Waddle
Case Number: 1:2020cv01454
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents and #4 Order served on Daniel Z. Castro. (Henshaw, R)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Henshaw, R)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:20-cv-2001 KJN) to Fresno (1:20-cv-1454 EPG) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/14/2020. (Henshaw, R)
October 13, 2020 CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Daniel Z. Castro, CDCR# V-59853 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
October 7, 2020 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Daniel Z. Castro. (Reader, L)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *10/6/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 11/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Reader, L)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Daniel Z. Castro. (Reader, L)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against C. Waddle by Daniel Z. Castro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Castro v. Waddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Waddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Z. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?