Alyson McNeill et al v. Boston Scientific Corp.
Plaintiff: George McNeill and Alyson McNeill
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv01456
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Civil New Case Documents, served on Jeffrey S. Grand NCAED, Christopher A. Seeger NCAED, Kenneth Soh NCAED. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 14, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Clerk's Notice, served on Jeffrey S. Grand NCAED, Christopher A. Seeger NCAED, Kenneth Soh NCAED. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEYS: If you are not admitted to the California State Bar and need to practice in this court via Pro Hac Vice, please submit the enclosed Pro Hac Vice Application along with the fee. If you are admitted to the California State Bar but are not admitted to practice in this court, please submit the enclosed Attorney Petition for Admission along with the fee. You will be emailed a log in and password to file electronically once doing either option. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Application) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:16-cv-05164.
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 DESIGNATION O RECORDS by Boston Scientific Corporation in support of #11 Designation of Record for MDL transfers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 86- ECF 7008 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Galloway.PDF, #2 Exhibit 87 - ECF 4818 - BSC_s MTE Galloway and Memo in Support.PDF, #3 Exhibit 88 - ECF 7048 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Response re Galloway.PDF, #4 Exhibit 89 - ECF 4958 - Pltfs' Opp to BSC's MTE and Memo in Support of its MTE Galloway.PDF, #5 Exhibit 90 - ECF 6031 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Galloway.PDF, #6 Exhibit 91 - ECF 7009 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Guelcher.pdf, #7 Exhibit 92 - ECF 7057 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Guelcher.pdf, #8 Exhibit 93 - ECF 7166 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of BSC's Prior Reply MTE Guelcher.pdf, #9 Exhibit 94 - ECF 7015 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Dr. V. Iakovlev.PDF, #10 Exhibit 95 - ECF 4819 - BSC's MTE Iakovlev.PDF, #11 Exhibit 96 - ECF 7050 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Daubert Response re Iakovlev.PDF, #12 Exhibit 97 - ECF 4959 - Pltf's Response to BSC's MTE Iakovlev.PDF, #13 Exhibit 97 - ECF 4959 - Exh A1.pdf, #14 Exhibit 97 - ECF 4959 - Exh A2.pdf, #15 Exhibit 97 - ECF 4959 - Exh B.pdf, #16 Exhibit 97 - ECF 4959 - Exh D.pdf, #17 Exhibit 97 - ECF 4959 - Exh E.pdf, #18 Exhibit 98 - ECF 6033 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Iakovlev.pdf, #19 Exhibit 99 - ECF 7017 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of Prior MTE Margolis.PDF, #20 Exhibit 100 - ECF 4804 - BSC_s MTE Margolis and Memo in Support.PDF, #21 Exhibit 100 - ECF 4804 - Exh A.pdf, #22 Exhibit 100 - ECF 4804 - Exh B.pdf, #23 Exhibit 100 - ECF 4804 - Exh C.pdf, #24 Exhibit 100 - ECF 4804 - Exh D.pdf, #25 Exhibit 100 - ECF 4804 - Exh E.pdf, #26 Exhibit 100 - ECF 4804 - Exh F.pdf, #27 Exhibit 100 - ECF 4804 - Exh G.pdf, #28 Exhibit 100 - ECF 4804 - Exh H.pdf, #29 Exhibit 100 - ECF 4804 - Exh I.pdf, #30 Exhibit 100 - ECF 4804 - Exh J.pdf, #31 Exhibit 101 - ECF 7046 - Pltfs' Notice of Adoption of Response re Margolis.PDF, #32 Exhibit 102 - ECF 4960 - Pltf's Response in Opp to BSC's MTE Margolis.PDF, #33 Exhibit 103 - ECF 6035 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Margolis.PDF, #34 Exhibit 104 - ECF 7010 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Mays.PDF, #35 Exhibit 105 - ECF 4805 - BSC_s Memo of Law in Support of Testimony of Mays.PDF, #36 Exhibit 106 - ECF 7065 - Plaintiff's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Mays.PDF, #37 Exhibit 107 - ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Dft_s MTE Mays.PDF, #38 Exhibit 107 - ECF 4972 - Exh 1.pdf, #39 Exhibit 107 - ECF 4972 - Exh 2.pdf, #40 Exhibit 107 - ECF 4972 - Exh 3.pdf, #41 Exhibit 107 - ECF 4972 - Exh 4.pdf, #42 Exhibit 107 - ECF 4972 - Exh 5.pdf, #43 Exhibit 107 - ECF 4972 - Exh 6.pdf, #44 Exhibit 107 - ECF 4972 - Exh 7.pdf, #45 Exhibit 107 - ECF 4972 - Exh 8.pdf, #46 Exhibit 107 - ECF 4972 - Exh 9.pdf, #47 Exhibit 107 - ECF 4972 - Exh 10.pdf, #48 Exhibit 108 - ECF 6036 - Memo Opinion and Order Mays.PDF, #49 Exhibit 109 - ECF 7016 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior MTE Ostergard.PDF, #50 Exhibit 110 - ECF 4821 - BSC's MTE Ostergard.PDF, #51 Exhibit 111 - ECF 7051 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Response re Ostergard.PDF, #52 Exhibit 112 - ECF 4961 - Pltf's Response to BSC's MTE Ostergard.PDF, #53 Exhibit 113 - ECF 6037 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert re Ostergard.PDF, #54 Exhibit 114 - ECF 7018 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Pence.PDF, #55 Exhibit 115 - ECF 4815 - BSC's MTE Pence and Memo in Support.PDF, #56 Exhibit 116 - ECF 7047 - Pltfs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Pence.PDF, #57 Exhibit 117 - ECF 4968 - Pltf's Response in Opp to BSC's MTE Pence.PDF, #58 Exhibit 117 - ECF 4968-1 - Exhibit A.pdf, #59 Exhibit 117 - ECF 4968-2 - Exhibit B.pdf, #60 Exhibit 118 - ECF 6038 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Pence.PDF, #61 Exhibit 119 - ECF 7011 - BSC's MTE General Causation Testimony of Dr. B. Rosenzweig.PDF, #62 Exhibit 120 - ECF 7085 - Pltf's Response to BSC's MTE General Causation Testimony of Rosenzweig.PDF, #63 Exhibit 121 - ECF 7175 - BSC's Reply ISO MTE General Causation Testimony of Rosenzweig.PDF, #64 Exhibit 122 - ECF 6039 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Rosenzweig.pdf, #65 Exhibit 123 - ECF 7013 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Shull.PDF, #66 Exhibit 124 - ECF 4810 - BSC's MTE Shull and Memo in Support.PDF, #67 Exhibit 125 - ECF 7044 - Plantiff's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Shull.PDF, #68 Exhibit 126 - ECF 4966 - Pltf's Opp to BSC's MTE Shull.PDF, #69 Exhibit 127 - ECF 6048 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Shull.PDF, #70 Exhibit 128 - ECF 7005 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior MTE Trepeta.PDF, #71 Exhibit 129 - ECF 4811 - BSC's MTE Trepeta and Memo in Support.PDF, #72 Exhibit 130 - ECF 7049 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Response re Trepeta.PDF, #73 Exhibit 131 - ECF 4963- Pltf's Response in Opposition to BSC's MTE re Trepeta.pdf, #74 Exhibit 132 - ECF 6050 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Trepeta.PDF, #75 Exhibit 133 - ECF 7012 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Veronikis.PDF, #76 Exhibit 134 - ECF 4807 - BSC_s MTE and Memo re Veronikis.PDF, #77 Exhibit 135 - ECF 7039 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert re Veronikis.PDF, #78 Exhibit 136 - ECF 7045 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert re Veronikis.PDF, #79 Exhibit 137 - ECF 4964 - Pltf's Response and Memo in Opp to MTE Veronikis.PDF, #80 Exhibit 138 - ECF 6051 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Veronikis.PDF, #81 Exhibit 139 - ECF 67 - ALLEN - BSC's Memo in Opposition to Pltf's MTE Green.PDF, #82 Exhibit 140 - ECF 78 - BSC's Memo in Opp to Pltf's MTE Culligan.PDF, #83 Exhibit 141 - ECF 46 - BSC's MTE Dunn and Memo in Support.PDF, #84 Exhibit 141 - ECF 46 - EXHIBITS A-H.pdf, #85 Exhibit 141 - ECF 46 - EXHIBITS I-O.pdf, #86 Exhibit 142 - ECF 71 - Pltf's Response to BSC's MTE Dunn.PDF, #87 Exhibit 142 - ECF 71 - Exh A.pdf, #88 Exhibit 142 - ECF 71 - Exh B.pdf, #89 Exhibit 142 - ECF 71 - Exh C.pdf, #90 Exhibit 143 - ECF 85 - BSC_s Reply MTE Dunn.PDF, #91 Exhibit 144 - ECF 52 - BSC's Memo MTE Guelcher.pdf, #92 Exhibit 145 - ECF 74 - Ptfs Opp to Def's MTE Guelcher.PDF, #93 Exhibit 146 - ECF 88 - BSC's Reply MTE Guelcher.PDF, #94 Exhibit 147 - ECF 100 - Memo, Opinion, and Order (Daubert Motions).pdf, #95 Exhibit 148 - ECF 127 - Pltf's Reply to Def's Opp to Pltf's MTE Culligan.PDF, #96 Exhibit 149 - ECF 145 - Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions).pdf, #97 Exhibit 150 - ECF 92 - FOWLER - Pltf's Reply in Support of MTE Green.PDF, #98 Exhibit 151 - ECF 115 - Fowler - Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions).pdf, #99 Exhibit 152 - ECF 104 - Memo, Opinion, and Order (Daubert Motions).pdf, #100 Exhibit 153 - ECF 216 - Pltf's Memo in Support of MTE Spiegelberg.PDF, #101 Exhibit 154 - ECF 275 - BSC's Opposition to Pltf's MTE Spiegelberg.PDF, #102 Exhibit 154 - ECF 275 - Exh A.pdf, #103 Exhibit 154 - ECF 275 - Exh B.pdf, #104 Exhibit 155 - ECF 473 - Amended Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions).pdf, #105 Exhibit 156 - ECF 2890 - Pltf's Response in Opp to Def's MTE Veronikis.PDF)(Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/2/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 - ECF 161 - Stipulated Protective Order.PDF, #2 Exhibit 02 - ECF 184 - Stipulation for the Production of Docs and Electronically Stored Info.PDF, #3 Exhibit 03 - ECF 196 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint.PDF, #4 Exhibit 04 - ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint.PDF, #5 Exhibit 05 - ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint.PDF, #6 Exhibit 06 - ECF 4955 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases.PDF, #7 Exhibit 07 - ECF 4987 - (Notice of Correction of Error in PTO-175 - Wave 4).PDF, #8 Exhibit 08 - ECF 6100 - Amended Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4.PDF, #9 Exhibit 09 -ECF 7003 - Pltf's Combined Motion and Memo to Exclude Anger.PDF, #10 Exhibit 10 - ECF 7069 - Memo in Opp to Motion to Exclude Anger.PDF, #11 Exhibit 11 - ECF 7173 - Pltf's Reply in Support of MTE Anger.PDF, #12 Exhibit 12 - ECF 6984 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Badylak.PDF, #13 Exhibit 13 - ECF 4826 - Pltf's Motion and Memo Support of MTE Badylak.PDF, #14 Exhibit 14 - ECF 7067 - Def's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Badylak.PDF, #15 Exhibit 15 -ECF 4976 - BSC's Opp to Pltf's MTE Badylak.PDF, #16 Exhibit 16 - ECF 5033 - Pltf_' Reply to Def's Response to Pltf's MTE Badylak.PDF, #17 Exhibit 17 - ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Badylak.PDF, #18 Exhibit 18 - ECF 7000 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Caraballo.PDF, #19 Exhibit 19 - ECF 4831 - Motion and Memo in Support of Pltf's MTE re Caraballo.PDF, #20 Exhibit 20 - ECF 7063 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Caraballo.PDF, #21 Exhibit 21 - ECF 4973 - BSC's Memo in Opp to Pltf's MTE Caraballo.PDF, #22 Exhibit 22 - ECF 5029 - Pltf's Reply to BSC's Opp to Pltf's MTE Caraballo.PDF, #23 Exhibit 23 - ECF 6042 - Memo Opinion and Order re Caraballo.PDF, #24 Exhibit 24 - ECF 6985 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Culligan.PDF, #25 Exhibit 25 - ECF 1013 - Pltf's Motion and Memo in Support of MTE Culligan.PDF, #26 Exhibit 26 -ECF 7060 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Culligan.PDF, #27 Exhibit 27 - ECF 7158 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply Culligan.PDF, #28 Exhibit 28 - ECF 6987 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Davies.PDF, #29 Exhibit 29 - ECF 4824 - Pltf's Combined MTE and Memo re Davies.PDF, #30 Exhibit 30 - ECF 7052 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Davies.PDF, #31 Exhibit 31 - ECF 4975 - BSC's Opp to Pltf's MTE Davies.PDF, #32 Exhibit 32 - ECF 5032 - Pltf's Reply Memo in Support of MTE Davies.PDF, #33 Exhibit 33 - ECF 6030 - Memo Opinion and Order re Davies.PDF, #34 Exhibit 34 - ECF 6993 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Goldberg.PDF, #35 Exhibit 35 - ECF 4829 - Pltf's Combined Motion and Memo in Support of MTE Goldberg.PDF, #36 Exhibit 36 - ECF 7064 - BSC' s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Goldberg.PDF, #37 Exhibit 37 - ECF 4980 - BSC's Opp to Pltf's MTE Goldberg.PDF, #38 Exhibit 38 - ECF 5036 - Pltf's Reply to Def's Response to Pltf'ss Combined MTE Goldberg.PDF, #39 Exhibit 39 - ECF 6043 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Goldberg.PDF, #40 Exhibit 40 - ECF 6994 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Green.PDF, #41 Exhibit 41 - ECF 1010 - WAVE 1 and 2 - Pltf_s Memo in Support of MTE Green.PDF, #42 Exhibit 41 - ECF 1010 - EX A.pdf, #43 Exhibit 41 - ECF 1010 - EX B.pdf, #44 Exhibit 41 - ECF 1010 - EX C.pdf, #45 Exhibit 41 - ECF 1010 - EX D.pdf, #46 Exhibit 41 - ECF 1010 - EX E.pdf, #47 Exhibit 41 - ECF 1010 - EX F.pdf, #48 Exhibit 42- ECF 1018 - BSC PTO-119 - Order re Pending Daubert Motions Filed in MDL.pdf, #49 Exhibit 43 - ECF 7055 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Lonny Green, MD.PDF, #50 Exhibit 44 - ECF 7159 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply re Green.PDF, #51 Exhibit 45 - ECF 6997 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Guerette.pdf, #52 Exhibit 46 - ECF 4823 - Motion and Memo in Support of Pltf's MTE Guerette.pdf, #53 Exhibit 47 - ECF 7059 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Guerette.pdf, #54 Exhibit 48 - ECF 4977 - BSC's Memo in Opposition to Pltf's MTE Guerette.pdf, #55 Exhibit 48 - ECF 4977 - Exh A.pdf, #56 Exhibit 48 - ECF 4977 - Exh B.pdf, #57 Exhibit 48 - ECF 4977 - Exh C.pdf, #58 Exhibit 48 - ECF 4977 - Exh D.pdf, #59 Exhibit 48 - ECF 4977 - Exh E.pdf, #60 Exhibit 49 - ECF 5035 - Reply Memo in Support of Pltf's MTE Guerette.pdf, #61 Exhibit 50 - ECF 6032 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Guerette.pdf, #62 Exhibit 51 - ECF 6995 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Little.PDF, #63 Exhibit 52 - ECF 4825 - Pltf's Motion and Memo Support of MTE Little.PDF, #64 Exhibit 52 - ECF 4825 - Exh 1.pdf, #65 Exhibit 52 - ECF 4825 - Exh 2.pdf, #66 Exhibit 52 - ECF 4825 - Exh 3.pdf, #67 Exhibit 52 - ECF 4825 - Exh 4.pdf, #68 Exhibit 52 - ECF 4825 - Exh 5.pdf, #69 Exhibit 53 - ECF 7066 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Little.PDF, #70 Exhibit 54 - ECF 4979 - BSC's Response in Opp to Pltf's MTE Little.PDF, #71 Exhibit 55 - ECF 5034 - Pltf's Reply to Def's Response to Pltf's MTE Little.PDF, #72 Exhibit 56 - ECF 6044 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Little.PDF, #73 Exhibit 57 - ECF 7006 - Pltf's MTE McCrery.PDF, #74 Exhibit 58 - ECF 7068 - BSC's Memo in Opposition to Pltf's MTE McCrery.PDF, #75 Exhibit 59 - ECF 7170 - Pltf's Reply in Support of MTE McCrery.PDF, #76 Exhibit 60 - ECF 6990 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Rice.PDF, #77 Exhibit 61 - ECF 4830 - Pltf's Combined Motion and MTE Rice.PDF, #78 Exhibit 62 - ECF 7041 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Rice.PDF, #79 Exhibit 63 - ECF 4971 - Memo in Opp to Pltf_s Combined Motion and MTE Rice.PDF, #80 Exhibit 63 - ECF 4971 - Ex A.pdf, #81 Exhibit 63 - ECF 4971 - Ex B.pdf, #82 Exhibit 63 - ECF 4971 - Ex C.pdf, #83 Exhibit 63 - ECF 4971 - Ex D.pdf, #84 Exhibit 64 - ECF 6046 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Rice.PDF, #85 Exhibit 65 - ECF 6986 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Rosenblatt.PDF, #86 Exhibit 66 - ECF 4833 - Pltf's MTE Rosenblatt and Memo in Support.PDF, #87 Exhibit 67 - ECF 7061 -BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Rosenblatt.PDF, #88 Exhibit 68 - ECF 4978 - BSC's Memo in Opp to Pltf's MTE Rosenblatt.PDF, #89 Exhibit 68 - ECF 4978 - Exh A.pdf, #90 Exhibit 68 - ECF 4978 - Exh B.pdf, #91 Exhibit 69 - ECF 5039 - Pltf's Reply Brief in Support of MTE Rosenblatt.PDF, #92 Exhibit 70 - ECF 6047 - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Dr. P. Rosenblatt.PDF, #93 Exhibit 71 - ECF 7004 - Pltf's MTE and Memo re Spiegelberg.PDF, #94 Exhibit 72 - ECF 4827 - Pltf's MTE Spiegelberg and Memo in Support.PDF, #95 Exhibit 73 - ECF 7088 - BSC's Response in Opposition to Pltf's MTE Spiegelberg.PDF, #96 Exhibit 74 - ECF 4969 - BSC's Response in Opp to Pltf's MTE Spiegelberg.PDF, #97 Exhibit 75 - ECF 7160 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg.PDF, #98 Exhibit 76 - ECF 5031 - Pltf's Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg.PDF, #99 Exhibit 77 - ECF 6049 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Spiegelberg.PDF, #100 Exhibit 78 - ECF 7002 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE re Dr. J. Blaivas.PDF, #101 Exhibit 79 - ECF 4822 - BSC's Motion and Memo in Support MTE Blaivas.PDF, #102 Exhibit 80 - ECF 7042 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Daubert Response re Blaivas.PDF, #103 Exhibit 81 - ECF 4962 - Pltf's Opp to BSC_s MTE Blaivas.PDF, #104 Exhibit 81 - ECF 4962-1 - Exhibit A-1.pdf, #105 Exhibit 81 - ECF 4962-2 - Exhibit A-2.pdf, #106 Exhibit 81 - ECF 4962-3 - Exhibit B-1.pdf, #107 Exhibit 81 - ECF 4962-4 - Exhibit B-2.pdf, #108 Exhibit 81 - ECF 4962-5 - Exhibit C.pdf, #109 Exhibit 82 - ECF 6029 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Blaivas.PDF, #110 Exhibit 83 - ECF 7007 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE re Dunn.PDF, #111 Exhibit 84 - ECF 7058 - Pltfs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Dunn.PDF, #112 Exhibit 85 - ECF 7165 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Reply re MTE Dunn.PDF)(Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/2/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 10/2/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/1/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/18/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/2/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing plaintiffs to show cause by 8/28/2020 why settlements with BSC have not been completed by submission of the appropriate release to BSC; defendant BSC may respond in each individual case where a plaintiff attempts to shows cause by 9/11/2020. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/29/2020. (cc: counsel of record) (mms) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/2/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 175. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 4 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases) (pma) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/2/2020.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael A. Tanenbaum on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/2/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/2/2020.]
January 9, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/2/2020.]
December 8, 2016 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman on 12/07/2016. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 12/7/2016, answer due 2/6/2017. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/2/2020.]
December 8, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/2/2020.]
June 9, 2016 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 147 (Order Re: Qualified Settlement Fund Sub-Account Boston Scientific Corporation & The Levensten Law Firm, P.C.) entered on 06/06/2016 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (jk) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/2/2020.]
June 8, 2016 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-4645114. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tlg) [Transferred from wvsd on 10/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alyson McNeill et al v. Boston Scientific Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman, NCAED
Represented By: Michael Bonasso, NCAED
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George McNeill
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Grand, NCAED
Represented By: Kenneth Soh, NCAED
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyson McNeill
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Grand, NCAED
Represented By: Kenneth Soh, NCAED
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?