RP Golden State Management, LLC et al v. Boyle et al
Plaintiff: RP Golden State Management, LLC, Asha Desai and Paul Desai
Defendant: JonesTurner Law, Stephen H. Boyle, Hinshaw & Culberston LLP, Daniel T. Clifford, Misty A. Murray, Clifford-Brownlaw Corp and Jeff Gissell
Case Number: 1:2020cv01479
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Findings and Recommendations served on Asha Desai, Paul Desai, RP Golden State Management, LLC. (Hall, S)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Dismissing the Action Without Prejudice for Failure to Pay the Filing Fee Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) and Failure to Obey the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/8/2020. Referred to District Judge. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
November 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order to Show Cause served on Asha Desai, Paul Desai, RP Golden State Management, LLC. (Hall, S)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not Be Dismissed, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/17/2020 Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
October 21, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order served on Asha Desai, Paul Desai, RP Golden State Management, LLC. (Hall, S)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS to Pay the Filing Fee or File a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/20/2020. (Hall, S)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen H. Boyle, Daniel T. Clifford, Clifford-Brownlaw Corp, Jeff Gissell, Hinshaw & Culberston LLP, JonesTurner Law, Misty A. Murray by Paul Desai, Asha Desai, RP Golden State Management, LLC. (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RP Golden State Management, LLC et al v. Boyle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RP Golden State Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asha Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JonesTurner Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen H. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hinshaw & Culberston LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel T. Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty A. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford-Brownlaw Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Gissell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?