(PC) Harris v. Singer et al
Plaintiff: Emmett James Harris
Defendant: J. Singer and Dr. Metts
Case Number: 1:2020cv01521
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Metts for Deliberate Indifference to Serious Medical Needs Proceed Past Screening and All Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed re #11 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/3/2020. Referred to Unassigned DJ; Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Rivera, O)
December 3, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Findings and Recommendations served on Emmett James Harris. (Rivera, O)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Emmett James Harris. (Rivera, O)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-1521 NONE-EPG (PC). (Martin-Gill, S)
November 13, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Emmett James Harris. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER #1 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/4/2020. 30-Day Deadline.(Lundstrom, T)
November 4, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Screening Order served on Emmett James Harris. (Lundstrom, T)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 Trust Account Statement) (Lundstrom, T)
November 3, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Emmett James Harris. (Lundstrom, T)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Emmett James Harris. (Lundstrom, T)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Emmett James Harris, CDC BC-3872 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Maldonado, C)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on SATF. (Maldonado, C)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *10/29/2020*;Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due by 12/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Maldonado, C)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Emmett James Harris. (Maldonado, C)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Metts, J. Singer by Emmett James Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Harris v. Singer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Metts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmett James Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?