Rendon v. Infinity Fasteners, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eric Rendon
Defendant: Infinity Fasteners, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01538
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 OPPOSITION by Eric Rendon to #7 Motion to Dismiss,, Motion to Strike,. (Attachments: #1 Notice Request for Judicial Notice In Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Smith, Michael)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/4/2020: (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that pursuant to General Order No. 617, addressing the public health emergency posed by the coronavirus (COVID-19) outbreak, all civil motions set for hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd will be decided on the papers. The parties should not contact Judge Drozd's chambers to inquire about whether a hearing on a pending motion will be held. If the court determines that a hearing is necessary, the court will issue an order to specially set the motion for hearing by telephone or video conference. In accordance with Judge Drozd's Standing Order in Light of Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California, the hearing date selected by the movant will continue to govern the deadlines for opposition and reply briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(c). (Thorp, J)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS, MOTION to STRIKE Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint.( Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.) by Infinity Fasteners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Murphy, Kellie)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading by Infinity Fasteners, Inc.. (Murphy, Kellie)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Eric Rendon. (Smith, Michael)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Smith, Michael)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Infinity Fasteners, Inc. re #2 Civil New Case Documents for DAD,. (Murphy, Kellie)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Order re Consent, #4 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno County Superior Court, case number 20CECG02019 by Infinity Fasteners, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9212876) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Demand for Jury)(Murphy, Kellie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rendon v. Infinity Fasteners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Rendon
Represented By: Michael J. F. Smith
Represented By: John L Migliazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Fasteners, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen Michelle Caprino
Represented By: Kellie M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?