(PC) Haqq v. Mims et al
Plaintiff: Ibn Haqq
Defendant: T. Gattie, Margaret Mims, R. Qomar and Brian Boggs
Case Number: 1:2020cv01547
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for 45-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to Pay Filing Fee by Ibn Haqq. (Sant Agata, S)
November 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Ibn Haqq. (Marrujo, C)
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-1547-NONE-GSA. (Marrujo, C)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Marrujo, C)
November 5, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings served on Ibn Haqq. (Sant Agata, S)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to SUBMIT Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or PAY Filing Fee within 30 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(Sant Agata, S)
November 2, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ibn Haqq. (Maldonado, C)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due by 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Brian Boggs, T. Gattie, Margaret Mims, R. Qomar by Ibn Haqq.(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Haqq v. Mims et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Gattie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Qomar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibn Haqq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?