(PC) Pina v. Ysusi et al
Plaintiff: Pablo P Pina
Defendant: B. Ysusi and J. Gonzalez
Case Number: 1:2020cv01735
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/25/2021. Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Second Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Pablo P Pina. (Jessen, A)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE100047429 $402.00 fbo Pablo P Pina D-28079 by State of California on 1/14/2021. (Rivera, O)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SUBMIT Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or PAY Filing Fee within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(Sant Agata, S)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, served on Pablo P Pina. (Sant Agata, S)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on KVSP. (Maldonado, C)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *12/10/2020*;Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due by 1/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Maldonado, C)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against J. Gonzalez, B. Ysusi by Pablo P Pina. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Pina v. Ysusi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Ysusi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo P Pina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?