Purnell v. Hunt et al
Plaintiff: Georgette G. Purnell
Defendant: Garcia-Peralta, Carter, N. Hunt and Luper
Case Number: 1:2020cv01759
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Plaintiff to 1) File a first amended complaint, 2) Notify the Court that she wished to proceed only on the claims against Defendant Hunt, Luper, Garcia-Peralta, and Carter for excessive force in violation of the Fourth Amendment, or 3) Notify the Court that she wishes to stand on her complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/11/2021. (Amended Complaint due by 2/15/2021)(Rosales, O.)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, served on Georgette G. Purnell. (Rosales, O.)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DENYING #3 Motion for Service to be Effected by US Marshals, instead of the Waiver of Summons Procedure signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/23/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Georgette G. Purnell. (Lundstrom, T)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Flores, E)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Service to be Effected by US Marshals, instead of the Waiver of Summons Procedure by Georgette G. Purnell. (Flores, E)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Georgette G. Purnell. (Flores, E)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carter, Garcia-Peralta, N. Hunt, Luper by Georgette G. Purnell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purnell v. Hunt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia-Peralta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgette G. Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?