Quair v. County of Kings, et al.
Plaintiff: Freddie Quair
Defendant: Edward Sinclair, John Silveria, Taylor Lopes, Neil Compston and County of Kings
Case Number: 1:2020cv01793
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand by County of Kings, Taylor Lopes. Attorney Arendt, James J. added.(Arendt, James)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Edward Sinclair served on 12/28/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (York, Darrell)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: John Silveria served on 12/28/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (York, Darrell)
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Neil Compston served on 12/28/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (York, Darrell)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Order re Consent, #4 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Neil Compston, County of Kings, Taylor Lopes, John Silveria, Edward Sinclair* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Darrell York* *York & Garvey* *137 N. Larchmont Blvd., #506* *Los Angeles, CA 90004*. (Rivera, O)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Darrell York re #1 Complaint: Under Local Rule 200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet using the correct form. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Sant Agata, S)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Freddie Quair (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(York, Darrell)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Neil Compston, County of Kings, Taylor Lopes, John Silveria, Edward Sinclair by Freddie Quair. Attorney York, Darrell added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9316198) (York, Darrell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quair v. County of Kings, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Silveria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Lopes
Represented By: James J. Arendt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Compston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kings
Represented By: James J. Arendt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Quair
Represented By: Dale K. Galipo
Represented By: Darrell York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?