(PC) Barrett v. Ciolli et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Barrett
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons Atwater and A. Ciolli
Case Number: 1:2020cv01802
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Lundstrom, T)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Anthony Barrett. (Lundstrom, T)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Anthony Barrett. (Lundstrom, T)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE: This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-01802-NONE-EPG (PC). (Jessen, A)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Jessen, A)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Jessen, A)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Anthony Barrett. (Jessen, A)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Anthony Barrett. (Jessen, A)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due by 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1331) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against A. Ciolli, Federal Bureau of Prisons Atwater by Anthony Barrett.(Maldonado, C)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Anthony Barrett. (Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Barrett v. Ciolli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons Atwater
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Ciolli
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?