Whitaker v. Hot Topic, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Hot Topic, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01832
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Hot Topic, Inc.. (Grunvald, Hayley)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Hot Topic, Inc..(Grunvald, Hayley)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint re #1 Complaint by Hot Topic, Inc.. Attorney Grunvald, Hayley Singer added. (Grunvald, Hayley)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Hot Topic, Inc. served on 1/4/2021, answer due 1/25/2021. (Handy, Russell)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 JLT Worksheet, #2 Order re Consent, #3 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Hot Topic, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Amanda Lockhart Seabock* *Center for Disability Access* *8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200* *San Diego, CA 92111*. (Rivera, O)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Brian Whitaker. Attorney Seabock, Amanda Lockhart added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9330069) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitaker v. Hot Topic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Russell Handy
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Dennis J. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hot Topic, Inc.
Represented By: Hayley Singer Grunvald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?