United States of America v. Hernandez
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Monica Nanette Hernandez
Case Number: 1:2020mc00050
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 Acknowledgment of Service and Answer of Garnishee (Wages) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment, #2 Writ of Continuing Garnishment (issued), #3 Clerks Notice of Instructions to Judgment Debtor re: Writ of Continuing Garnishment (issued), #4 Instructions to Defendant/Judgment Debtor on How to Claim Exemptions; Claim for Exemption Form, #5 Instructions to Judgment Debtor re: Objecting to the Answer of Garnishee, #6 Request for Hearing (blank form), #7 Notice of Availability of a Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction and Appeals Instructions, #8 Consent to/Decline of Jurisdiction of United States Magistrate Judge (blank form))(Tubesing, Robin)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Application of Writ of Continuing Garnishment (wages), #2 Writ of Continuing Garnishment (issued), #3 Acknowledgment of Service and Answer of Garnishee (blank form), #4 Instructions to Garnishee, #5 Instructions to the Garnishee Calculating the Amount to be Withheld, #6 Notice of Availability of a Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction and Appeals Instructions, #7 Consent to/Decline of Jurisdiction of United States Magistrate Judge (blank form))(Tubesing, Robin)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Instructions to Judgment Debtor re: Writ of continuing Garishment by United States of America. (Lundstrom, T)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 WRIT of Continuing Garnishment ISSUED. (Lundstrom, T)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST for PROPOSED CLERKS NOTICE OF INSTRUCTIONS TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR RE: WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT for Clerk's Signature and Issuance by United States of America. (Tubesing, Robin)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for PROPOSED WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT for Clerk's Signature and Issuance by United States of America. (Tubesing, Robin)
July 21, 2020 NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED. (Lundstrom, T)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Continuing Garnishment (Partners Personnel-wages) by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tubesing, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Nanette Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robin Tubesing, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?