Vongsvirates v. Rushmore Loan Management Services
Plaintiff: Vichai Vongsvirates
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services
Case Number: 1:2021cv00012
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED for Failure to State a Claim, Failure to Comply and Failure to Prosecute re #1 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/19/2021. Referred to Unassigned DJ. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
February 19, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Findings and Recommendations served on Vichai Vongsvirates. (Jessen, A)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER disregarding #5 Exhibit "F" signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/22/2021. (Lundstrom, T)
January 22, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Vichai Vongsvirates. (Lundstrom, T)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 EXHIBIT "F" by Vichai Vongsvirates. (Lundstrom, T)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCREENING ORDER granting Plaintiff leave to file Amended Complaint within 30-Days #1 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/8/2021. (Lundstrom, T)
January 8, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Vichai Vongsvirates. (Lundstrom, T)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/6/2021. (Jessen, A)
January 6, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Vichai Vongsvirates. (Jessen, A)
January 5, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Jessen, A)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Vichai Vongsvirates. (Jessen, A)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rushmore Loan Management Services by Vichai Vongsvirates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vongsvirates v. Rushmore Loan Management Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vichai Vongsvirates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?