Hill v. International Paper Company
Plaintiff: Andrew Hill
Defendant: International Paper Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00029
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Andrew Hill by Andrew Hill.(Crist, Ryan)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/17/2021(Kusamura, W)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Andrew Hill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Crist, Ryan)
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal,,, to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by International Paper Company. (Fischbein, Jason)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Eric Daniel Rouen. (Rouen, Eric)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) by International Paper Company. (Fischbein, Jason)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by International Paper Company (Fischbein, Jason)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of California - County of Fresno, case number 20CECG03529 by Andrew Hill. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9345284) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Summons, #2 Exhibit B - State Class Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - State Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - State Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes, #5 Exhibit E - BPBAG Local No. 388M CBA (Buena Park Bag), #6 Exhibit F - Local No. 986 CBA (Carson), #7 Exhibit G - ELK Local No. 388M CBA (Elk Grove), #8 Exhibit H - State Notice of Removal to Adverse Party, #9 Exhibit I - State Notice of Removal, #10 Declaration of Cissy Braslow, #11 Notice of Interested Parties)(Fischbein, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. International Paper Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Hill
Represented By: Kitty Kit Yee Szeto
Represented By: R. Rex Parris
Represented By: Eric Daniel Rouen
Represented By: Ryan Crist
Represented By: John M Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Jason Adam Fischbein
Represented By: Aaron F. Olsen
Represented By: Brittany M. Wunderlich
Represented By: Danielle Hultenius Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?