(HC) Stewart v. Macomber
Petitioner: Gregory W. Stewart
Respondent: J. Macomber
Case Number: 1:2021cv00063
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Findings and Recommendations, #8 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Gregory W. Stewart. (Jessen, A)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending to Dismiss Petition as Successive re #1 signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 3/9/2021. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE: This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. The new case number is: 1:21-cv-00063-DAD-HBK (HC). (Jessen, A)
March 3, 2021 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Paroled: 7 Minute Order,,, sent to Gregory W. Stewart at Salinas Valley State Prison, P.O. Box 1050, Soledad, CA 93690. Notice of Change of Address due by 5/10/2021. (Maldonado, C)
February 11, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Minute Order served on Gregory W. Stewart. (Dunbar-Kari, K)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: TEXT ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE FROM PETITIONER: Petitioner submitted a #5 change of address form, informing the Court that his new address is 1440 Brantley St., Merced, CA 95341. However, according to the CDCR inmate locator, Petitioner is serving a life without parole sentence and is currently incarcerated at Mule Creek State Prison. All case documents should be served on Petitioner at his current place of incarceration. Accordingly, the Court orders Petitioner to submit a change of address form confirming his current place of incarceration. The clerk of court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Petitioner at (1) 1440 Brantley St., Merced, CA 95341; (2) Salinas Valley State Prison, PO Box 1050, Soledad, CA 93960; and (3) Mule Creek State Prison, P.O. Box 409099, Ione, CA 95640. Signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on February 11, 2021. (SER)(Dunbar-Kari, K)
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Maldonado, C)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Gregory W. Stewart. (Maldonado, C)
January 15, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Gregory W. Stewart. (Jessen, A)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS re #2 as to Gregory W. Stewart signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 1/15/2021. (Jessen, A)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Petitioner's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Gregory W. Stewart. (Jessen, A)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against J. Macomber by Gregory W. Stewart. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Stewart v. Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory W. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?