(PC) Gamboa, Jr. v. B. Gonzales, et al.
Plaintiff: Clemente M. Gamboa, Jr.
Defendant: I. Pascual, J. Fernandez, Diaz, S. Navarette and B Gonzales
Case Number: 1:2021cv00079
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #18 Order, served on Clemente M. Gamboa, Jr.. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Respond to Screening Order within Twenty-One Days; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Send Plaintiff Copy of Screening Order #14 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/18/2021. ( Responses due within 21-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
March 12, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to Robert Presley Detention Center, P.O. Box 710, Riverside, CA 92501 by Clemente M. Gamboa, Jr. (Maldonado, C)
January 28, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Clemente M. Gamboa, Jr. >I>Address Remains the Same. (Sant Agata, S)
January 28, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Sant Agata, S)
January 27, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Screening Order, served on Clemente M. Gamboa, Jr.. (Sant Agata, S)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCREENING ORDER; ORDER for Plaintiff to: (1) NOTIFY the Court that he wants to Proceed Only on his Claim against Defendant Gonzales for Excessive Force in Violation of the Eighth Amendment; (2) FILE a First Amended Complaint; or (3) NOTIFY the Court that he wants to Stand on his Complaint; Thirty (30) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Sant Agata, S)
January 26, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Clemente M. Gamboa, Jr.. (Marrujo, C)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #5 #7 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Marrujo, C)
January 22, 2021 Filing 12 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Clemente M. Gamboa, Jr. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 21, 2021 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Clemente M. Gamboa, Jr., CDC BL7528 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Rivera, O)
January 21, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Clemente M. Gamboa, Jr. (Rivera, O)
January 21, 2021 Filing 10 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due within 30 days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Rivera, O)
January 20, 2021 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-08793.
January 20, 2021 case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of California. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021) [Transferred from cand on 1/20/2021.]
January 19, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021) [Transferred from cand on 1/20/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Robert M. Illman vacating #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; vacating #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. For the reasons described herein, it is FURTHER ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. (rmilc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 1/20/2021.]
December 31, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner's Application and Declaration for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Clemente M. Gamboa, Jr.. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope)(tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2020) [Transferred from cand on 1/20/2021.]
December 31, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Clemente M. Gamboa, Jr., 12/16/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2020) [Transferred from cand on 1/20/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner's Application and Declaration for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Clemente M. Gamboa, Jr.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020) [Transferred from cand on 1/20/2021.]
December 11, 2020 mailed copy of re #3 Clerks Notice re Ifp to Plaintiff. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 1/20/2021.]
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Clemente M. Gamboa, Jr.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 1/20/2021.]
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 1/19/2021. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 1/20/2021.]
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 Letter from Clemente M. Gamboa, Jr., dated 12/3/2020. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 1/20/2021.]
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under The Civil Rights Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1983) against Diaz, J. Fernandez, B. Gonzales, S. Navarette, I. Pascual, (Filing Fee: Ifpp entered 12/11/2020). Filed by Clemente M. Gamboa, Jr.. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope)(tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 1/20/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Gamboa, Jr. v. B. Gonzales, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Pascual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Navarette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clemente M. Gamboa, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?