Whitaker v. AE Retail West LLC
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: AE Retail West LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00112
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant AE Retail West LLC to Respond to Initial Complaint By Not More than 28 Days [L.R. 144) by AE Retail West LLC. Attorney Gao, Kathy H. added. (Gao, Kathy)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: AE Retail West LLC served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. (Seabock, Amanda)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 JLT Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *AE Retail West LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Amanda Seabock* *8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200* *San Diego, CA 92111*. (Maldonado, C)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Brian Whitaker. Attorney Seabock, Amanda Lockhart added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9382117) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitaker v. AE Retail West LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AE Retail West LLC
Represented By: Kathy H. Gao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Dennis J. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?