(PC) Lewis v. Cisneros
Plaintiff: Paul Dixon Lewis
Defendant: Teresa Cisneros
Case Number: 1:2021cv00115
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order served on Paul Dixon Lewis. (Rivera, O)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING #10 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/22/2021. $402 filing fee due within thirty (30) days. (Rivera, O)
February 18, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Findings and Recommendations, 9 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Paul Dixon Lewis. (Lundstrom, T)
February 18, 2021 Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to deny Plaintiff's Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 ; Clerk to assign District Judge to case signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/18/2021. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is: 1:21-cv-00115-AWI-JLT-PC. (Lundstrom, T)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #7 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Paul Dixon Lewis. (Maldonado, C)
February 1, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order to Show Cause served on Paul Dixon Lewis. (Jessen, A)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Should Not be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/30/2021. Show Cause Response due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFIED PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Paul Dixon Lewis. (Jessen, A)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on SATF. (Maldonado, C)
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *1/28/2021*;Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due by 3/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Maldonado, C)
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Paul Dixon Lewis, CDC D-38903 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Maldonado, C)
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Paul Dixon Lewis. (Maldonado, C)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Teresa Cisneros by Paul Dixon Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Lewis v. Cisneros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dixon Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Cisneros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?