(SS) Martinez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Deborah Martinez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv00160
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Oum, Sathya)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 3/01/2021: (Text Only Entry) General Order No. 615 issued on April 14, 2020 requires a stay of all Social Security actions filed after February 1, 2020 and brought under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) until the Commissioner can begin normal operations at the Office of Appellate Hearings Operations and resume preparation of the copy of the certified administrative record (CAR). ACCORDINGLY, this action is stayed consistent with General Order No. 615. The stay will be automatically lifted when the Commissioner files the CAR in this action. Plaintiff may move to lift the stay by showing good cause, i.e. showing plaintiff lacks the income or resources necessary to meet minimum subsistence. (Dunbar-Kari, K)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Deborah Martinez. Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (Maldonado, C)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. The new case number is: 1:21-cv-00160-AWI-HBK(SS). (Sant Agata, S)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Deborah Martinez pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Lundstrom, T)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 2/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 USM Instructions). (Lundstrom, T)
February 9, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Maldonado, C)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Deborah Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Deborah Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Martinez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sathya Oum, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Martinez
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?