(SS) Ingham v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Scott Leslie Ingham
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv00161
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coder, Ellinor)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Scott Leslie Ingham. Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/16/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts)(Pena, Jonathan)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/10/2021: The parties are hereby notified that pursuant to General Order Number 615, attached hereto, this action has been stayed pending further order of the court. See E.D. Cal. G.O. No. 615, 6, 10. This stay does not prevent, and Plaintiff is directed to proceed with, service of process. (Text Only Entry)(Rooney, M)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan O. Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, PC* *2440 Tulare St. Ste. 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Maldonado, C)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 5/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Scott Leslie Ingham. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9405290) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Ingham v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ellinor Ravenel Coder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Leslie Ingham
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?