(SS) Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lasharee Devona Williams
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv00229
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER STAYING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/1/2021(Hernandez, M)
March 31, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rosales, Steven)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Lasharee Devona Williams. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/23/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rosales, Steven)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 6/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Steven Gilbert Rosales* *Law Offices of Lawrence D. Rohlfing* *12631 East Imperial Highway, Suite C-115* *Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670*. (Lundstrom, T)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Proceed IFP and directing Clerk of Court to issue Summons signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 USM Instructions). (Lundstrom, T)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER re Amended Application to proceed without prepayment by Lasharee Devona Williams. (Rosales, Steven)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to AMEND the #1 Social Security Complaint,, MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS amending #1 Social Security Complaint, by Lasharee Devona Williams. (Rosales, Steven)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and Requiring Plaintiff to File Long Form Application signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/23/2021. Motion for IFP due within Twenty-Days. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application Long Form)(Flores, E)
February 23, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Maldonado, C)
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Lasharee Devona Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosales, Steven)
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT For Review Of Final Decision Of The Commissioner Of Social Security against Commissioner of Social Security by Lasharee Devona Williams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of interested parties, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosales, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lasharee Devona Williams
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?