Mayen v. MA Medina Farm Labor Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Julio Mayen
Defendant: Bolthouse Farms Kern County, Bolt House Farms, W.M. Bolthouse Farms, Inc., MA Medina Farm Labor Services Inc. and Bolthouse Farms Cuyama Cuyama
Case Number: 1:2021cv00318
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/6/2021: (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that pursuant to General Order No. 617, addressing the public health emergency posed by the coronavirus (COVID-19) outbreak, all civil motions set for hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd will be decided on the papers. The parties should not contact Judge Drozd's chambers to inquire about whether a hearing on a pending motion will be held. If the court determines that a hearing is necessary, the court will issue an order to specially set the motion for hearing by telephone or video conference. In accordance with Judge Drozd's Standing Order in Light of Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California, the hearing date selected by the movant will continue to govern the deadlines for opposition and reply briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(c). (Thorp, J)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/6/2021: In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2021 is CONTINUED to 8/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Text Only Entry) (Hall, S)
April 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS by W.M. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sonia Vucetic in Support of Wm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Iliana Lopez in Support of Wm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Battenfeld, John)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by W.M. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.. Attorney Vucetic, Sonia A. added. (Vucetic, Sonia)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION (Joint) Extending Deadline for Defendant Wm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc. to Respond to Complaint by W.M. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.. (Battenfeld, John)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2021 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 JLT Worksheet, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Order re Consent, #5 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) by Wm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.. (Battenfeld, John)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Wm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.. (Battenfeld, John)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Wm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc. (Battenfeld, John)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern Superior Court, case number BCV-20-102530 by Wm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9445330) (Battenfeld, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayen v. MA Medina Farm Labor Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bolthouse Farms Kern County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bolt House Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.M. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.
Represented By: John Spivey Battenfeld
Represented By: Sonia A. Vucetic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MA Medina Farm Labor Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bolthouse Farms Cuyama Cuyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Mayen
Represented By: Thomas Henry Schelly
Represented By: Kevin Andrew Lipeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?