De Los Santos v. Acosta et al
Plaintiff: Christine De Los Santos
Defendant: Officer Latoya Townsley, State of California, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Lieutenant Noe C Montanez, Officer Jennifer Easter, Officer Herrera, Officer Acosta and Officer Payne
Case Number: 1:2021cv00397
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER TO PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Officer Acosta, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Officer Jennifer Easter, Officer Herrera, Lieutenant Noe C Montanez, Officer Payne, State of California, Officer Latoya Townsley. (Wilson, Matthew)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Officer Acosta, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Officer Jennifer Easter, Officer Herrera, Lieutenant Noe C Montanez, Officer Payne, State of California, Officer Latoya Townsley (Wilson, Matthew)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-20-102955 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9470376) (Wilson, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Los Santos v. Acosta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Latoya Townsley
Represented By: Tracy S. Hendrickson
Represented By: Matthew Ross Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Tracy S. Hendrickson
Represented By: Matthew Ross Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Tracy S. Hendrickson
Represented By: Matthew Ross Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Noe C Montanez
Represented By: Tracy S. Hendrickson
Represented By: Matthew Ross Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jennifer Easter
Represented By: Tracy S. Hendrickson
Represented By: Matthew Ross Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Herrera
Represented By: Tracy S. Hendrickson
Represented By: Matthew Ross Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Acosta
Represented By: Tracy S. Hendrickson
Represented By: Matthew Ross Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Payne
Represented By: Tracy S. Hendrickson
Represented By: Matthew Ross Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine De Los Santos
Represented By: Corey Alan Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?