Wyatt et al v. County of Stanislaus et al
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Wyatt and Makeda Wyatt
Defendant: Araceli Figueroa, Claudia Llamas, Julie Bartlett, County of Stanislaus, Diana Torres, Jones and Denise Aguilar
Case Number: 1:2021cv00455
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Claudia Llamas on 3/18/2021, Answer due 5/17/2021 (Swingle, Bradley)
April 27, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Diana Torres on 3/18/2021, Answer due 5/17/2021 (Swingle, Bradley)
April 27, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Jones on 3/18/2021, Answer due 5/17/2021 (Swingle, Bradley)
April 27, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Araceli Figueroa on 3/18/2021, Answer due 5/17/2021 (Swingle, Bradley)
April 27, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Julie Bartlett on 3/18/2021, Answer due 5/17/2021 (Swingle, Bradley)
April 27, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Denise Aguilar on 3/18/2021, Answer due 5/17/2021 (Swingle, Bradley)
April 26, 2021 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE : Attn: Bradley James Swingle **WRONG EVENT USED** AS TO DOCKET ENTRIES #5 THRU #16 .Please refile each set (Waiver of Service of Summons with Notice of Lawsuit as second page for each Party and USE the EVENT : "Waiver of Service Executed" found in category - Initial Pleadings & Services/Service of Process/Waiver of Service Executed. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 26, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE : Please disregard docket entries #5 thru #16 - Incorrect; Wrong Event Used. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 22, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST for Waiver of Service of Summons by County of Stanislaus. (Swingle, Bradley)
April 22, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST for Waiver of Service of Summons by County of Stanislaus. (Swingle, Bradley)
April 22, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST for Waiver of Service of Summons by County of Stanislaus. (Swingle, Bradley)
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST for Waiver of Service of Summons by County of Stanislaus. (Swingle, Bradley)
April 22, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST for Waiver of Service of Summons by County of Stanislaus. (Swingle, Bradley)
April 22, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST for Waiver of Service of Summons by County of Stanislaus. (Swingle, Bradley)
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST for Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons by County of Stanislaus. (Swingle, Bradley)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST for Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons by County of Stanislaus. (Swingle, Bradley)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST for Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons by County of Stanislaus. (Swingle, Bradley)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST for Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons by County of Stanislaus. (Swingle, Bradley)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST for Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons by County of Stanislaus. (Swingle, Bradley)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST for Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons by County of Stanislaus. Attorney Swingle, Bradley James added. (Swingle, Bradley)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Jones, Claudia Llamas, Diana Torres* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Dennis Raymond Ingols* *Law Offices of Dennis R. Ingols* *111 North Market St., Suite 300* *San Jose, CA 95113*. (Marrujo, C)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Denise Aguilar, Julie Bartlett, County of Stanislaus, Araceli Figueroa* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Dennis Raymond Ingols* *Law Offices of Dennis R. Ingols* *111 North Market St., Suite 300* *San Jose, CA 95113*. (Marrujo, C)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Makeda Wyatt, Emmanuel Wyatt. Attorney Ingols, Dennis Raymond added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9485295) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ingols, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyatt et al v. County of Stanislaus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Araceli Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Llamas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Stanislaus
Represented By: Bradley James Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Wyatt
Represented By: Dennis Raymond Ingols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makeda Wyatt
Represented By: Dennis Raymond Ingols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?