Garcia et al v. City of Farmersville et al
Plaintiff: Adrieana Garcia, Maria Elena Garcia, Gloria Garcia, C. G., S. G. and J. G.
Defendant: Tulare County, Matthias Hernandez, City of Visalia, Corona, S. Jajyo, City of Farmersville, Cardenas, Taylor Hobson, Ralph Vasquez, Jr., Jay Brock, Jereme Brogan, Eduardo Carrillo, Paulino Manzano and Jason Kennedy
Case Number: 1:2021cv00482
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 28 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Freidenberg, Lauren)
April 29, 2021 Filing 27 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Cha, Daniel)
April 29, 2021 Filing 26 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Myers, Amy)
April 29, 2021 Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Herr, Leonard)
April 23, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to City of Visalia on 4/16/2021, Answer due 6/15/2021 (Herr, Leonard)
April 22, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Jay Brock on 4/16/2021, Answer due 6/15/2021 (McMurray, Randy)
April 22, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Ralph Vasquez, Jr on 4/16/2021, Answer due 6/15/2021 (McMurray, Randy)
April 22, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Paulino Manzano on 4/16/2021, Answer due 6/15/2021 (McMurray, Randy)
April 22, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Jereme Brogan on 4/16/2021, Answer due 6/15/2021 (McMurray, Randy)
April 22, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Corona on 4/16/2021, Answer due 6/15/2021 (McMurray, Randy)
April 22, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Eduardo Carrillo on 4/16/2021, Answer due 6/15/2021 (McMurray, Randy)
April 22, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to City of Farmersville on 4/16/2021, Answer due 6/15/2021 (McMurray, Randy)
April 19, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Taylor Hobson on 4/16/2021, Answer due 6/15/2021 (McMurray, Randy)
April 19, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Matthias Hernandez on 4/16/2021, Answer due 6/15/2021 (McMurray, Randy)
April 19, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Jason Kennedy on 4/16/2021, Answer due 6/15/2021 (McMurray, Randy)
April 19, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Cardenas on 4/16/2021, Answer due 6/15/2021 (McMurray, Randy)
April 19, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Tulare County on 4/16/2021, Answer due 6/15/2021 (McMurray, Randy)
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Daniel Solomon Cha for Jay Brock,Daniel Solomon Cha for Jereme Brogan,Daniel Solomon Cha for Eduardo Carrillo,Daniel Solomon Cha for City of Farmersville,Daniel Solomon Cha for Corona,Daniel Solomon Cha for Paulino Manzano,Daniel Solomon Cha for Ralph Vasquez, Jr (Cha, Daniel)
April 6, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Jay Brock, Jereme Brogan, Eduardo Carrillo, Jason Kennedy, Paulino Manzano, Ralph Vasquez, Jr* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Randy H. McMurray* *McMurray Henriks, LLP* *811 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1640* *Los Angeles, CA 90017*. (Flores, E)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cardenas, City of Farmersville, City of Visalia, Corona, Matthias Hernandez, Taylor Hobson, S. Jajyo, Tulare County, Eduardo Carrillo, Jereme Brogan, paulino manzano, Ralph S Vasquez, Jay Brock, Jason Kennedy by Gloria Garcia, C. G., J. G., Maria Elena Garcia, S. G., Adrieana Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McMurray, Randy)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/30/2021. (Apodaca, P)
March 29, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by C. G., J. G., S. G., Adrieana Garcia, Gloria Garcia, Maria Elena Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(Freidenberg, Lauren)
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by C. G., J. G., S. G., Adrieana Garcia, Gloria Garcia, Maria Elena Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Freidenberg, Lauren)
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by City of Visalia.(Herr, Leonard)
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand by City of Farmersville, Corona.(Praet, Bruce)
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Flores, E)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by City of Farmersville (Praet, Bruce)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Tulare Superior Court, case number VCU285945 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Certification of Interested Parties)(Praet, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. City of Farmersville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrieana Garcia
Represented By: Randy H. McMurray
Represented By: Yana Gayane Henriks
Represented By: Lauren Ida Freidenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Garcia
Represented By: Randy H. McMurray
Represented By: Yana Gayane Henriks
Represented By: Lauren Ida Freidenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Garcia
Represented By: Randy H. McMurray
Represented By: Yana Gayane Henriks
Represented By: Lauren Ida Freidenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. G.
Represented By: Randy H. McMurray
Represented By: Yana Gayane Henriks
Represented By: Lauren Ida Freidenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. G.
Represented By: Randy H. McMurray
Represented By: Yana Gayane Henriks
Represented By: Lauren Ida Freidenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. G.
Represented By: Randy H. McMurray
Represented By: Yana Gayane Henriks
Represented By: Lauren Ida Freidenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulare County
Represented By: Kathleen A. Taylor
Represented By: Amy I. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthias Hernandez
Represented By: Kathleen A. Taylor
Represented By: Amy I. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Visalia
Represented By: Leonard Charles Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corona
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Represented By: Daniel Solomon Cha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Jajyo
Represented By: Kathleen A. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Farmersville
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Praet
Represented By: Daniel Solomon Cha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardenas
Represented By: Kathleen A. Taylor
Represented By: Amy I. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Hobson
Represented By: Kathleen A. Taylor
Represented By: Amy I. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Vasquez, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Solomon Cha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Brock
Represented By: Daniel Solomon Cha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jereme Brogan
Represented By: Daniel Solomon Cha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel Solomon Cha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulino Manzano
Represented By: Daniel Solomon Cha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Kennedy
Represented By: Amy I. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?