Williams v. Browns et al
Plaintiff: Prince Paul Raymond Williams
Defendant: Cheryl L. Browns and Raenna Johnson
Case Number: 1:2021cv00622
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Maldonado, C)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/07/2021. First Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty-Days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Maldonado, C)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Sant Agata, S)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Prince Paul Raymond Williams.(Maldonado, C)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Flores, E)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Flores, E)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cheryl L. Browns, Raenna Johnson by Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Browns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince Paul Raymond Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl L. Browns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raenna Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?