Neil Stevens v. Rust-Oleum Corporation
Plaintiff: Neil Stevens
Defendant: Rust-Oleum Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00743
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): On June 18, 2021, Plaintiff filed a notice of voluntary dismissal under Rule 41. (Doc. No. #4 .) In light of Plaintiff's voluntary dismissal, this action is terminated by operation of law without further order from the Court. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). This Court VACATES all pending dates and matters. The Clerk of the Court is directed to assign a district judge for the purpose of closing this case and then to CLOSE THIS CASE. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/21/2021. (Valdez, E)
June 21, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Minute Order, served on Andrew W. Ferich PHV. (Valdez, E)
June 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Neil Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wolfson, Tina)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Rust-Oleum Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tina Wolfson* *Ahdoot & Wolfson, PC* *2600 West Olive Avenue,Suite 500* *Burbank, CA 91505*. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rust-Oleum Corporation by Neil Stevens. Attorney Wolfson, Tina added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9587902) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Neil Stevens Pursuant to California Civil Code 1780(d))(Wolfson, Tina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neil Stevens v. Rust-Oleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rust-Oleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Stevens
Represented By: Christopher Eric Stiner
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Represented By: Andrew W. Ferich, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?