McKinley v. County of Fresno et al
Plaintiff: Douglas D McKinley, II
Defendant: Monserrate McCary, Frank J Maldonado Montez, Fresno County D.S.S./C.P.S. Offices and County of Fresno
Case Number: 1:2021cv00754
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denying Plaintiff Douglas McKinley, II's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Requiring Plaintiff to Pay Filing Fee in this Matter re #2 , #3 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/10/2021. Referred to Judge Unassigned DJ. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Maldonado, C)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Findings and Recommendations served on Douglas D McKinley II. (Maldonado, C)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying Application to Proceed IFP without prejudice and requiring Plaintiff to file Long Form Application or pay filing fee #2 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/12/2021. 20-Day Filing Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Long Form IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Douglas D McKinley II. (Lundstrom, T)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Lundstrom, T)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Douglas D McKinley, II. (Lundstrom, T)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Fresno, Fresno County D.S.S./C.P.S. Offices, Frank J Maldonado Montez, Monserrate McCary by Douglas D McKinley, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinley v. County of Fresno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monserrate McCary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank J Maldonado Montez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County D.S.S./C.P.S. Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas D McKinley, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?