P. et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: A. F. P. and J. F. C.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00780
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/7/2021: (Text Only Entry) On June 17, 2021, the parties filed a #5 joint motion to hold this action in abeyance pending settlement negotiations. Good cause appearing, this action is to be held in abeyance until August 16, 2021. The parties shall file a status report no later than August 16, 2021 to notify the court whether an additional abeyance is sought. If not, all existing deadlines will be extended by 60 days from the existing deadlines and the scheduling conference will be continued to a date convenient for the court. (Thorp, J)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION Joint Motion to Hold Action in Abeyance by United States of America. Attorney Shelledy, David Taylor added. (Shelledy, David)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Kent W. Kraushaar* *Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP* *300 S Grand Ave, 22nd Fl* *Los Angeles, CA 90071*. (Marrujo, C)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER [ Plaintiffs' Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and for Protective Order ] by J. F. C., A. F. P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and for Protective Order)(Kraushaar, Kent)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America by A. F. P., J. F. C.. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9602399) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kraushaar, Kent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P. et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. F. P.
Represented By: Susan L Baker
Represented By: Lisa R. Weddle
Represented By: Kent W. Kraushaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. F. C.
Represented By: Susan L Baker
Represented By: Lisa R. Weddle
Represented By: Kent W. Kraushaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: David Taylor Shelledy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?