Nicholas Honchariw v. County of Stanislaus
Plaintiff: Nicholas Honchariw
Defendant: County of Stanislaus
Case Number: 1:2021cv00801
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY by Nicholas Honchariw re #10 Opposition to Motion. (Honchariw, Nicholas)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPPOSITION by County of Stanislaus to #6 Motion to Remand,. (Zinn, Matthew)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/28/2021: (Text Only Entry) *** Due to the pending motion(s), the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 8/17/2021, is CONTINUED to 5/10/2022, at 9:30 AM, in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties SHALL file their joint scheduling report 7 days prior to the conference. (Kusamura, W)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of ERRATA by All Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal.. (Zinn, Matthew)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/9/2021: (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that pursuant to General Order No. 617, addressing the public health emergency posed by the coronavirus (COVID-19) outbreak, all civil motions set for hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd will be decided on the papers. The parties should not contact Judge Drozd's chambers to inquire about whether a hearing on a pending motion will be held. If the court determines that a hearing is necessary, the court will issue an order to specially set the motion for hearing by telephone or video conference. In accordance with Judge Drozd's Standing Order in Light of Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California, the hearing date selected by the movant will continue to govern the deadlines for opposition and reply briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(c). (Thorp, J)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to REMAND by Nicholas Honchariw. Motion Hearing set for 07/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memo in support of motion, #2 Affidavit Affidavit in support of motion)(Honchariw, Nicholas) Modified on 6/9/2021 added motion date. (Thorp, J).
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/25/2021. (Kusamura, W)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time to Respond to Supplemental Complaint by County of Stanislaus. (Zinn, Matthew)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:16-cv-01183-DAD-BAM by County of Stanislaus. (Zinn, Matthew)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Stanislaus County Superior Court, case number 2026470 by County of Stanislaus. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9605612) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zinn, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholas Honchariw v. County of Stanislaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Honchariw
Represented By: Nicholas James Honchariw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Stanislaus
Represented By: Matthew D. Zinn
Represented By: Aaron M. Stanton
Represented By: Thomas Edward Boze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?