(PC) Ramos v. Mayfield et al
Plaintiff: Leobardo Eric Ramos
Defendant: Mayfield and R. Lesina
Case Number: 1:2021cv01036
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCREENING ORDER; ORDER for Plaintiff to: (1) FILE a First Amended Complaint; or (2) NOTIFY the Court That He Wants to Stand on His Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/16/2021. First Amended Complaint or Notice due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form) (Rivera, O)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Screening Order served on Leobardo Eric Ramos. (Rivera, O)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Leobardo Eric Ramos. Address Remains the Same. (Sant Agata, S)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Sant Agata, S)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Jessen, A)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Leobardo Eric Ramos. (Jessen, A)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Leobardo Eric Ramos. (Jessen, A)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Leobardo Eric Ramos, CDC AS-7703 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Jessen, A)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Leobardo Eric Ramos. (Jessen, A)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Leobardo Eric Ramos. (Jessen, A)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against R. Lesina, Mayfield by Leobardo Eric Ramos. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Ramos v. Mayfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leobardo Eric Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Lesina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?