Conde v. Department of the Treasury et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Conde
Defendant: Department of the Treasury and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2021cv01072
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE WHY THE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S ORDER. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/26/2021.(Kusamura, W)
August 27, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order to Show Cause served on Christopher Conde. (Kusamura, W)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice #2 Application to Proceed Without the Prepayment of Fees and Requiring Plaintiff to File an Amended Application or Filing Fee Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Jessen, A)
July 14, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Christopher Conde. (Jessen, A)
July 12, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Jessen, A)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Christopher Conde. (Jessen, A)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service by Christopher Conde. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conde v. Department of the Treasury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Conde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?