Teamsters Local 87 et al v. Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, Inc.
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 87, Teamsters Local 137, Teamsters Local 386 and Teamsters Local 431
Defendant: Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01102
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER. Upon review, the Court notes the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference #3 contained a scrivener's error identifying the incorrect year for the date of the scheduling conference although the docket entry reflected the correct year. In an abundance of caution, the Court enters this Minute Order to confirm the scheduling conference in this matter will be held on April 21, 2022. signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on August 5, 2021. (alr)
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, Inc. (McEntee, Peter)
July 21, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, Inc. on 7/19/2021, Answer due 9/17/2021 (McEntee, Peter)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:21-cv-00969 by Teamsters Local 137, Teamsters Local 386, Teamsters Local 431, Teamsters Local 87. (McEntee, Peter)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (HBK) before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Peter Mainland McEntee* *Beeson, Tayer & Bodine, APC* *520 Capitol Mall, Suite 300* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Marrujo, C)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, Complaint for Breach of Contract against Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, Inc. by Teamsters Local 386, Teamsters Local 137, Teamsters Local 87, Teamsters Local 431. Attorney McEntee, Peter Mainland added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9717967) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Peter McEntee in Support of Complaint to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, Complaint for Breach of Contract, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Peter McEntee, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Peter McEntee, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Peter McEntee, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Peter McEntee, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Peter McEntee, #8 Exhibit F to Declaration of Peter McEntee)(McEntee, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teamsters Local 87 et al v. Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 87
Represented By: Peter Mainland McEntee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 137
Represented By: Peter Mainland McEntee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 386
Represented By: Peter Mainland McEntee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 431
Represented By: Peter Mainland McEntee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?