Marvik v. The Screen Actors Guild et al
Plaintiff: Steve Marvik
Defendant: The Screen Actors Guild, Fox TV, Cable News Network, SAG, Barack Obama, Fox News Network and CNN
Case Number: 1:2021cv01161
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT dated *8/26/2021* pursuant to order #4 . (Jessen, A)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ADOPTING #3 Findings and Recommendations, Denying #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Dismissing the Action Without Prejudice signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/25/2021. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, #5 Judgment served on Steve Marvik. (Jessen, A)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Dismissing the Action Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/4/2021. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Findings and Recommendations served on Steve Marvik. (Hall, S)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Rivera, O)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Steve Marvik. (Rivera, O)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cable News Network, Fox TV, Barack Obama, The Screen Actors Guild by Steve Marvik. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marvik v. The Screen Actors Guild et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Screen Actors Guild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox TV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cable News Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barack Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox News Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Marvik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?